EP2563218 - METHOD, APPARATUS, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND SYSTEM FOR MEASURING OSCILLATORY MOTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Court Of The University of Edinburgh Old College South Bridge Edinburgh EH8 9YL / GB | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARVIND, Damal University of Edinburgh School of Informatics Informatics Forum 10 Crichton Street Edinburgh EH8 9AB / GB | 02 /
BATES, Andrew University of Edinburgh School of Informatics Informatics Forum 10 Crichton Street Edinburgh EH8 9AB / GB | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | Higgin, Paul Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2013/10] | Higgin, Paul Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11724443.4 | 16.05.2011 | [2018/47] | WO2011GB50934 | Priority number, date | GB20100009379 | 04.06.2010 Original published format: GB 201009379 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011151634 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563218 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2563218 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/08, A61B5/113, G01H1/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/113 (EP,US);
A61B5/0004 (US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,US);
A61B5/1116 (EP,US);
A61B5/1121 (US);
A61B5/6801 (US);
A61B5/72 (US);
G01H1/00 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0223 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND -SYSTEM ZUM MESSEN OSZILLIERENDER BEWEGUNG | [2013/10] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND SYSTEM FOR MEASURING OSCILLATORY MOTION | [2013/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE MESURE D'UN MOUVEMENT OSCILLATOIRE | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 23.08.2013 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 09.09.2013 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 06.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2011 | AL | 21.11.2018 | AT | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | CZ | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | ES | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | IT | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MK | 21.11.2018 | MT | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | RS | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | SM | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | NO | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | IE | 16.05.2019 | LU | 16.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.05.2011 | |
AL | 21.11.2018 | ||
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
MT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.05.2011 | |
AL | 21.11.2018 | ||
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
NO | 21.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1271099 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-31* the whole document *; | [A]WO03005893 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009062628 (YAMAMOTO MATSUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2009138896 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,4-10,13,20-31 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 22 * * page 6, line 9 - page 8, line 8 * [I] 2,3,11,12,14-19 | Examination | EP1656880 | US5687714 |