EP2582757 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BLENDS OF POLYLACTIDES (PLA) AND THERMOPLASTIC POLYURETHANES (TPU) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/17] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING BLENDS FROM POLYLACTIDES (PLA) AND THERMOPLASTIC POLYURETHANES (TPU) | ||
[2019/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2019/44] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILMER, Klaus Hageweder Allee 31 49448 Marl / DE | 02 /
BRÜNING, Kai Malvenweg 19 27232 Sulingen / DE | 03 /
FRITZ, Hans-Gerhard Gotenweg 10 73066 Uhingen / DE | 04 /
ZGAVERDEA, Alina Corina Wallmerstraße 131 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 11724651.2 | 14.06.2011 | [2019/44] | WO2011EP59811 | Priority number, date | EP20100166000 | 15.06.2010 Original published format: EP 10166000 | [2013/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011157691 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2582757 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2582757 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/04, C08J3/00 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
C08J3/005 (EP);
C08J5/249 (EP,US);
C08G18/0895 (EP);
C08G18/12 (EP);
C08G18/4238 (EP);
C08G18/428 (EP);
C08G18/6637 (EP);
C08G18/6674 (EP);
C08G18/798 (EP);
C08L67/04 (EP);
C08L75/04 (EP);
C08J2367/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/42 (EP);
C08L67/04, C08L2666/20 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08L2666/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BLENDS AUS POLYLACTIDEN (PLA) UND THERMOPLASTISCHEN POLYURETHANEN (TPU) | [2013/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BLENDS OF POLYLACTIDES (PLA) AND THERMOPLASTIC POLYURETHANES (TPU) | [2019/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MÉLANGES DE POLYLACTIDES (PLA) ET DE POLYURÉTHANES THERMOPLASTIQUES (TPU) | [2019/30] |
Former [2013/17] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING BLENDS FROM POLYLACTIDES (PLA) AND THERMOPLASTIC POLYURETHANES (TPU) | ||
Former [2013/17] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MÉLANGES DE POLYLACTIDES (PLA) ET DE POLYURÉTHANES THERMOPLASTIQUES (TPU) | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 09.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 02.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2011 | AL | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | ES | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | IT | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | NL | 30.10.2019 | PL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SE | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | AT | 14.06.2020 | GB | 14.06.2020 | IE | 14.06.2020 | LU | 14.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | FR | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
AT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 14.06.2020 | ||
IE | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 14.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
AT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 14.06.2020 | ||
IE | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 14.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
AT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 14.06.2020 | ||
IE | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 14.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
GB | 14.06.2020 | ||
IE | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 14.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
GB | 14.06.2020 | ||
IE | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 14.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
IE | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 14.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]CN101508831 ; | [Y]JP2009067923 ; | [Y]CN1760237 ; | [X]CN101519527 ; | [X]JP2002037995 ; | [Y]EP0515203 (NOVACOR CHEM INT [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1, 20, 21 * * page 4, lines 30-53 *; | [Y]US2003232933 (LAGNEAUX DIDIER [FR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP1679349 (KYOWA HAKKO CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 6-8 * claims 1,9 * * examples 1-7 * [Y] 1-10; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 62, Database accession no. 2009-N04905, XP002661125 & CN101508831 A 20090819 (SHENZHEN KEJU NEW MATERIAL CO LTD) [X] 6-10 * abstract * [Y] 1-10 | [A] - YUAN Y ET AL, "POLYURETHANE TOUGHENED POLYLACTIDE", POLYMER BULLETIN, SPRINGER, HEIDELBERG, DE, (19980401), vol. 40, no. 4/05, doi:10.1007/S002890050280, ISSN 0170-0839, pages 485 - 490, XP000750414 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002890050280 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 25, Database accession no. 2009-G51265, XP002661126 & JP2009067923 A 20090402 (DOKURITSU GYOSEI HOJIN SANGYO GIJUTSU SO) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 76, Database accession no. 2006-728841, XP002661127 & CN1760237 A 20060419 (UNIV DONGHUA) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 69, Database accession no. 2009-N52014, XP002661128 & CN101519527 A 20090902 (SHANGDONG WEIGAO GROUP MEDICAL POLYMER P) [X] 6-8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 49, Database accession no. 2002-456781, XP002661129 & JP2002037995 A 20020206 (SHIMADZU CORP) [X] 6-8 * abstract * | [X] - LOH ET AL, "Biodegradable thermogelling poly(ester urethane)s consisting of poly(lactic acid) - Thermodynamics of micellization and hydrolytic degradation", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20080213), vol. 29, no. 14, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2008.01.016, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 2164 - 2172, XP022513842 [X] 6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2008.01.016 | by applicant | EP0308683 | JPH05163431 | EP0670339 | DE19607870 | US5695884 | DE19649290 | DE19706452 | WO0051660 | US6395833 | US2006121812 | US2006141883 | EP1679349 | US2007161731 | EP1826225 | DE102006009096 | JP2008308599 | WO2009022076 | - Plastics Additive Handbook, HANSER PUBLISHERS, (2001), pages 98 - 107,116- | - Plastics Additive Handbook, HANSER PUBLISHERS, (2001), pages 116 - 122 |