EP2556176 - ULTRASONIC DEGASSING OF MOLTEN METALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Southwire Company, LLC One Southwire Drive Carrollton, GA 30119-4400 / US | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states Southwire Company One Southwire Drive Carrollton, Georgia 30119-4400 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gill, Kevin, S 180 Muse Bridge Road Carrollton, GA 30116 / US | 02 /
Rundquist, Victor, F 498 Shirey Dairy Road Carrollton, GA 30116 / US | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/11] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2013/07] | Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 11724834.4 | 08.04.2011 | [2020/11] | WO2011US31781 | Priority number, date | US20100322324P | 09.04.2010 Original published format: US 322324 P | [2013/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011127402 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2556176 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2556176 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C22B9/02, C22B9/05, C22B21/06, C21C7/072, G01N29/24, F27D3/16 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
C21C7/072 (EP,KR,US);
C22B9/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22B9/00 (US);
C22B21/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22B21/064 (EP,US);
C22B9/026 (EP,US);
C22B9/05 (EP,KR,US);
F27D3/16 (EP,US);
F27D2003/166 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/07] | C22B9/02, C22B9/05, C22B21/06, C21C7/072, G01N29/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL-ENTGASUNG VON METALLSCHMELZEN | [2019/42] | English: | ULTRASONIC DEGASSING OF MOLTEN METALS | [2013/07] | French: | DÉGAZAGE ULTRASONIQUE DE MÉTAUX EN FUSION | [2019/42] |
Former [2013/07] | ULTRASCHALLENTGASUNG VON GESCHMOLZENEN METALLEN | ||
Former [2013/07] | DÉGAZAGE ULTRASONIQUE DE MÉTAUX FONDUS | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 14.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | CY | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
RS | 11.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4287755 (MANSFIELD THOMAS L) [Y] 19-25 * column 2 - column 5; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [Y]JPS6146368 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [Y] 19-21 * abstract *; | [X]JPH01127624 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [X] 1-3,11-13,16-18 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2009111536 (RUNDQUIST VICTOR F [US], et al) [Y] 19-25* figures 1-3; claims 1-8 *; | [XY]US7682556 (HAN QINGYOU [US], et al) [X] 1-18,26-28 * column 2 - column 6; figures 1-4; claims 1-10 * [Y] 19-25 | by applicant | US2009224443 | US20110322324 |