EP2603140 - DEVICE FOR EVALUATING CONDITION OF SKIN OR HAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4P 0DY / GB | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4P 0DY / GB | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2013/25] | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4P 0DY / GB | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRISHNAN, Srinivasan Unilever R&D 50 Commerce Drive Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | 02 /
NICHOL, Jamie, Gordon J. Gordon Nichol&Company LLC 37 Golden Avenue Arlington, Massachusetts 02476 / US | 03 /
CICHOWLAS, Bruce Affirm Technology 32 Pine Lane Framingham, Massachusetts 01701 / US | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Corsten, Michael Allan Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [2013/25] | Application number, filing date | 11725745.1 | 16.06.2011 | WO2011EP59995 | Priority number, date | US20100855728 | 13.08.2010 Original published format: US 855728 | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012019809 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2603140 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2603140 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/103 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
A61B5/441 (EP,US);
A61B5/0075 (EP,US);
A61B5/448 (EP,US);
A61B2562/029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEURTEILUNG DES ZUSTANDES DER HAUT ODER DES HAARES | [2013/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR EVALUATING CONDITION OF SKIN OR HAIR | [2013/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉVALUATION DE L'ÉTAT DE LA PEAU OU DES CHEVEUX | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 01.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2011 | AL | 01.04.2015 | AT | 01.04.2015 | BE | 01.04.2015 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | ES | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | HR | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MK | 01.04.2015 | MT | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | RS | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | SM | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | IE | 16.06.2015 | LU | 16.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | NO | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.06.2011 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MK | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 16.06.2011 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [YD]JP2003210416 (WAVE CYBER KK) [YD] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [00225] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 5,6,7,10,11 *; | [Y]US2007185392 (SHERMAN FAIZ F [US], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0056] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2009112071 (LEBOEUF STEVEN FRANCIS [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2009318908 (VAN PIETERSON LIESBETH [NL], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0059] * * figures 1,1A,2A,2B,3A-3C,5 *; | [A]KR20090131370 (I JONG DAE [KR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2010049907 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 7 - line 26 * * page 3, line 3 - line 15 * * page 4, line 6 - line 7 * * page 6, line 19 - page 8, line 9 ** figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US5622692 | US5945112 | JP2003210416 |