EP2616409 - BUILDING MATERIAL AND BUILDING SYSTEM ELEMENT AND ALSO PROCESSES FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vicat Tour Manhattan 6 place de l'Iris 92095 Paris La Défense / FR | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÄHLI, Beat Oberholz 15 CH-3054 Schüpfen / CH | 02 /
RYTZ, Gerhard Schwarzenburgstrasse 6 CH-3007 Bern / CH | 03 /
RUCHTI, Beat Dreihubelweg 40 CH-3250 Lyss / CH | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | BOVARD AG Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 11725766.7 | 17.06.2011 | WO2011EP60159 | Priority number, date | CH20100001492 | 16.09.2010 Original published format: CH 14922010 | [2013/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012034724 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2616409 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02, C04B38/02, C04B38/08 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B22/04 (US);
B29C44/12 (US);
C04B38/02 (EP,US);
C04B38/08 (EP,US);
E04C1/40 (US);
C04B2111/00612 (EP,US);
C04B2111/28 (EP,US);
C04B2111/40 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/06, C04B14/28, C04B41/4582 (EP,US);
C04B38/02, C04B14/28, C04B22/04, C04B28/04, C04B38/0051, C04B38/0074, C04B41/5079 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | BAUSTOFF UND BAUSYSTEM-ELEMENT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [2013/30] | English: | BUILDING MATERIAL AND BUILDING SYSTEM ELEMENT AND ALSO PROCESSES FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2013/30] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE CONSTRUCTION ET ÉLÉMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE CONSTRUCTION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LES FABRIQUER | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 14.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/48] | 06.07.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.07.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2324105 (HYDERABAD IND LIMITED [IN]) [X] 1-5,8-11,13-17 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraph 3 *; | [X]WO2004063124 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 2, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 11, paragraph 4 ** examples 1,2 *; | [X]CN101619598 (JIANGUO WANG) [X] 1,2,10,12-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0049348 | US5110084 | EP0647603 | GB2324105 | WO2004063124 | EP1988228 | CN101619598 |