EP2580236 - TEAR LIPOCALIN MUTEINS BINDING IL-4 R ALPHA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pieris Pharmaceuticals GmbH Lise-Meitner-Strasse 30 85354 Freising-Weihenstephan / DE | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states Pieris Pharmaceuticals GmbH Lise-Meitner-Strasse 30 85354 Freising-Weihenstephan / DE | ||
For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 431 83 Mölndal / SE | |||
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Pieris AG Lise-Meitner-Strasse 30 85354 Freising / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOHLBAUM, Andreas Ter Platen 25B 9000 Ghent / BE | 02 /
BAEHRE, Alexandra Cas Oorthuyskade 152 1087 Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
MATSCHINER, Gabriele Gottfried-Keller-Str. 13 81245 Munich / DE | 04 /
TRENTMANN, Stefan Finkenweg 23a 85391 Allershausen / DE | 05 /
KIRCHFLED, Klaus Ueber der Glonn 17 85238 Petershausen / DE | 06 /
CHRISTIAN, Hans-Juergen Thalbacher Strasse 49a 85368 Moosburg / DE | [2019/14] |
Former [2013/16] | 01 /
HOHLBAUM, Andreas Schuckelbergstr. 5 85307 Paunzhausen / DE | ||
02 /
BAEHRE, Alexandra Cas Oorthuyskade 152 1087 Amsterdam / NL | |||
03 /
MATSCHINER, Gabriele Bavariaring 35 80336 Muenchen / DE | |||
04 /
TRENTMANN, Stefan Finkenweg 23a 85391 Allershausen / DE | |||
05 /
KIRCHFLED, Klaus Ueber der Glonn 17 85238 Petershausen / DE | |||
06 /
CHRISTIAN, Hans-Juergen Thalbacher Strasse 49a 85368 Moosburg / DE | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/14] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2013/16] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11726380.6 | 08.06.2011 | [2019/14] | WO2011EP59420 | Priority number, date | US20100352461P | 08.06.2010 Original published format: US 352461 P | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011154420 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2580236 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2580236 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/435, C07K14/47, C12N15/10, C12N9/16 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,CN,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/435 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (US);
C12N5/10 (US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (CN);
C07K2319/00 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUTEINE VON TRÄNEN-LIPOCALIN MIT AFFINITÄT FÜR IL-4 R ALPHA | [2018/04] | English: | TEAR LIPOCALIN MUTEINS BINDING IL-4 R ALPHA | [2013/16] | French: | MUTÉINES DE LIPOCALINE DES LARMES SE LIANT À IL-4 R ALPHA | [2013/16] |
Former [2013/16] | AN IL-4-R-ALPHA BINDENDE TROPFEN-LIPOCALINMUTEINE | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 04.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005019256 (PIERIS PROTEOLAB AG [DE], et al); | [ID]WO2008015239 (PIERIS AG [DE], et al); | by applicant | EP0330451 | EP0361991 | US5728553 | WO9916873 | WO9964016 | WO0075308 | US6177074 | US6403564 | US6500930 | WO03029463 | WO03029471 | WO03029462 | US2003069395 | US6620413 | US6696245 | WO2005019256 | WO2005019254 | WO2005019255 | WO2006056464 | WO2007038619 | WO2008015239 |