EP2561136 - THE USE OF ACIDIC WATER IN THE MANUFACTURE OF PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDKALK OY AB Skräbbölevägen 18 21600 Pargas / FI | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAASTAMOINEN, Sakari Väinöntie 12 FI-13210 Hämeenlinna / FI | 02 /
VIRTANEN, Pentti Veikontie 1 FI-37630 Valkeakoski / FI | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/09] | Wasström, Kathy Mikaela Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B FI-00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 11726459.8 | 21.04.2011 | WO2011FI50366 | Priority number, date | FI20100005437 | 22.04.2010 Original published format: FI 20105437 | [2013/09] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011131843 | Date: | 27.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2561136 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/00, D21H17/70, D21H17/67 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
D21H17/675 (EP,FI,US);
D21H21/10 (FI);
D21H21/52 (EP,FI,US);
D21H17/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON SAUREM WASSER IN DER PAPIERHERSTELLUNG | [2013/09] | English: | THE USE OF ACIDIC WATER IN THE MANUFACTURE OF PAPER | [2013/09] | French: | UTILISATION D'EAU ACIDE DANS LA FABRICATION DE PAPIER | [2013/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 11.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 15.09.2015 | Observations by third parties | 05.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/19] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2007051480 (DOELLE KLAUS [DE]); | [XY]US2007151681 (DOELLE KLAUS [DE]); | [Y]US2007181275 (BALL MIKE [BE]); | [XY]US2008210391 (PFALZER LOTHAR [DE], et al) | by applicant | EP0344984 | FI85969B | EP0791685 | WO2005100690 | US2005257907 | US7056419 | other | WO2010043768 | - ALAN RAWLE, "BASIC PRINCIPLES OF PARTICLE SIZE ANALYSIS", MALVERN INSTRUMENTS LIMITED, (2008), pages 1 - 8, URL: HTTP://WWW.RCI.RUTGERS.EDU/~MOGHE/PSD%20BASICS.PDF, XP055009141 | - "A GUIDEBOOK TO PARTICLE SIZE", HORIBA, (2012), URL: HTTPS://WWW.HORIBA.COM/FILEADMIN/UPLOADS/SCIENTIFIC/DOCUMENTS/PSA/PSA_GUIDEBOOK.PDF, XP055155827 |