Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103026347B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2016 | B | CN103026347 | 03.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011US37804 | 24.05.2011 | US78920710 | 27.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2577474 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2019 | B1 | EP2577474 | 10.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US37804 | 24.05.2011 | US78920710 | 27.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011149986 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78920710 | 27.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8990582 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2015 | B2 | US2011293097 | 01.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78920710 | 27.05.2010 | Type | Divisional application | Application deemed to be withdrawn : 09.08.2019 |