EP2470392 - TRANSFER CASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/27] | TRANSFER GEAR | ||
[2013/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oberaigner, Paul Roman Fürling 33 4150 Berg bei Rohrbach / AT | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2012/27] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 A-1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 11726647.8 | 03.06.2011 | WO2011AT00250 | Priority number, date | AT20100001081 | 25.06.2010 Original published format: AT 10812010 | [2012/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011160144 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2470392 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2470392 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/346 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
B60K17/3467 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTEILERGETRIEBE | [2012/27] | English: | TRANSFER CASE | [2013/06] | French: | BOITE DE TRANSFERT | [2013/06] |
Former [2012/27] | TRANSFER GEAR | ||
Former [2012/27] | BOÎTE DE TRANSFERT | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 25.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2011 | AL | 07.08.2013 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | DK | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | ES | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | HR | 07.08.2013 | IT | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | LV | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | MK | 07.08.2013 | MT | 07.08.2013 | NL | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | RS | 07.08.2013 | SE | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | SM | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | NO | 07.11.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.06.2011 | |
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MK | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
RS | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 03.06.2011 | |
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
RS | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.06.2011 | |
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
RS | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
RS | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | FI | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 07.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0242106 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO2009069255 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US2007180940 (MIZON RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US2007049451 (MIZON RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2006128515 (MUELLER JOSEPH G [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | DE19538661 | WO02065000 | WO0208006 | WO9901310 | EP1254326 | US4569252 |