|
13.06.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
118 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
118 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
119 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
119 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.12.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
28.12.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
119 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Request for correction of obvious error |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Invitation to correct priority claim |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
114 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
81 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
77 |