EP2587977 - NOZZLE FOR VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/19] | VACUUM CLEANER NOZZLE | ||
[2014/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOCKELT, Stefan Nelkenweg 6 97618 Rödelmaier / DE | 02 /
KLEINHENZ, Albert Auerhahnstr. 12 97659 Schönau a.d.Brend / DE | 03 /
KRAMMER, Michael Seeweg 8 97659 Schönau / DE | [2013/19] | Application number, filing date | 11727476.1 | 27.06.2011 | WO2011EP60716 | Priority number, date | DE20101030731 | 30.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010030731 | [2013/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012000937 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2587977 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2587977 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/02, A47L9/24 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A47L9/02 (EP);
A47L9/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAUBSAUGERDÜSE | [2013/19] | English: | NOZZLE FOR VACUUM CLEANER | [2014/39] | French: | BUSE POUR ASPIRATEUR | [2014/39] |
Former [2013/19] | VACUUM CLEANER NOZZLE | ||
Former [2013/19] | BUSE D'ASPIRATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 29.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2011 | AL | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | ES | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | RS | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | SM | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IE | 27.06.2015 | LU | 27.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.06.2011 | |
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IE | 27.06.2015 | ||
LU | 27.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 27.06.2011 | |
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IE | 27.06.2015 | ||
LU | 27.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IE | 27.06.2015 | ||
LU | 27.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IE | 27.06.2015 | ||
LU | 27.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IE | 27.06.2015 | ||
LU | 27.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
LU | 27.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 04.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE60013774T (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [AD] 1-13 * paragraphs [0038] - [0053] *; | [AD]EP1364608 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-13 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0036] *; | [A]US2010024156 (DE SOTO-BURT WIDALYS LUZ [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0057] - [0058] *; | [A]US2005262662 (ROSCHI RICCARDO [IT], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0013] *; | [A]EP1806087 (SCOTT & FETZER CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | DE60013774T | EP1364608 |