EP2590735 - INTERLOCK AND PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ineos Sales (UK) Limited Hawkslease Chapel Lane Lyndhurst Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB | [2013/49] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states Ineos Commercial Services UK Limited Hawkslease Chapel Lane Lyndhurst Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMAYOU, Jean-Louis 18 allee des Restanques F-13620 Carry Le Rouet / FR | 02 /
LEE, Stephen Kevin 17 Watery Lane Merton Park London SW20 9AA / GB | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | King, Alex, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | King, Alex, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB | ||
Former [2013/20] | King, Alex, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11727494.4 | 28.06.2011 | [2015/49] | WO2011EP60791 | Priority number, date | EP20100168853 | 08.07.2010 Original published format: EP 10168853 | [2013/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012004154 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2590735 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2590735 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/00, B01J19/00, C08F2/06, C08F2/34, C08F10/02, C08F10/06, F26B25/00, C08F110/02, C08F110/06, C08F2/01, C08F10/00 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
C08F2/34 (EP,US);
C08F2/01 (US);
B01J19/00 (US);
B01J19/002 (EP,US);
B01J8/0015 (EP,US);
B01J8/0035 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/06 (EP,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F2/06 (US);
F26B25/00 (US);
B01J2208/00061 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00761 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00268 (EP,US);
C08F2400/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/06, C08F2/34 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/20] | B01J19/00, C08F2/06, C08F2/34, C08F10/02, C08F10/06, F26B25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPERRE UND VERFAHREN | [2013/20] | English: | INTERLOCK AND PROCESS | [2013/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 07.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2011 | AL | 02.12.2015 | BG | 02.12.2015 | CY | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | DK | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | FI | 02.12.2015 | HR | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | MC | 02.12.2015 | MK | 02.12.2015 | PL | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | RS | 02.12.2015 | SE | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | SM | 02.12.2015 | TR | 02.12.2015 | NO | 02.03.2016 | GR | 03.03.2016 | IS | 02.04.2016 | PT | 04.04.2016 | GB | 28.06.2016 | IE | 28.06.2016 | LU | 28.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
GB | 28.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.06.2016 | ||
LU | 28.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
GB | 28.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.06.2016 | ||
LU | 28.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
GB | 28.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.06.2016 | ||
LU | 28.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
GB | 28.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
GB | 28.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | FI | 02.12.2015 | |
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 02.12.2015 | |
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 02.12.2015 | |
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 02.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3257375 (NORWOOD DONALD D) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 12 - column 2, line 21; claim 2 * * column 3, line 22 - line 29 *; | [X]WO0212353 (EQUISTAR CHEM LP [US]) [X] 1-14* page 1, line 20 - line 22 *; | [X]EP1914246 (INEOS MFG BELGIUM NV [BE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0043] , [0053]; examples 1,2 *; | [X]EP1914248 (INEOS MFG BELGIUM NV [BE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0039] , [0049]; example 1; claim 8 *; | [X]EP1914250 (INEOS MFG BELGIUM NV [BE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0038] , [0042] , [0048]; examples 1,2 *; | [X] - K. Y. CHOI, W. H. RAY, "The dynamic behaviour of continuous stirred-bed reactors for the solid catalyzed gas phase polymerization of propylene", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, (19881231), vol. 43, no. 10, pages 2587 - 2604, XP002610731 [X] 1-14 * page 2598 - page 2603 * | Examination | WO9313843 | by applicant | US4372758 | EP0127253 | US4921919 | US5376742 | WO02088194 | WO2008024517 |