EP2577936 - ACCELERATOR SYSTEM FOR USE WITH SECURE DATA STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laurich, Lawrence A. 193 Anaheim Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | For all designated states Sample, Stephen Paul 15027 Bohlman Road Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | For all designated states Wang, Michael H. 68 Southdown Ct. Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | For all designated states Kandimalla, Babu Rao 3038 Dante Ct. San Jose, CA 95135 / US | For all designated states Orsini, Rick L. 2100 Kings Forest Lane Flower Mound, Texas 75028 / US | For all designated states O'Hare, Mark S. 8 Kennedy Court Coto De Caza, California 92679 / US | For all designated states Martin, Don 11006 Sterling Cover Drive Chesterfield, VA 23838 / US | For all designated states Casselman, Steven Mark 1841 Briarwood Drive Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'HARE, Mark, S. 8 Kennedy Court Coto De Caza, CA 92679 / US | 02 /
LAURICH, Lawrence, A. 193 Anaheim Terrace, Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US | 03 /
SAMPLE, Stephen, Paul 15027 Bohlman Road Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 04 /
WANG, Michael, H. 68 Southdown Ct. Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | 05 /
KANDIMALLA, Babu, Rao 3038 Dante Ct. San Jose, CA 95135 / US | 06 /
ORSINI, Rick, L. 2100 Kings Forest Lane Flower Mound, TX 75028 / US | 07 /
MARTIN, Don 11006 Sterling Cover Drive Chesterfield, VA 23838 / US | 08 /
CASSELMAN, Steven, Mark 1841 Briarwood Drive Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Shipp, Nicholas Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11727863.0 | 27.05.2011 | WO2011US38369 | Priority number, date | US20100349560P | 28.05.2010 Original published format: US 349560 P | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011150346 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2577936 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
G06F13/102 (EP,US);
G06F21/602 (EP);
G06F21/72 (EP);
G06F21/76 (US);
G06F21/78 (EP);
G06F21/85 (EP);
G06F3/061 (US);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/0646 (US);
G06F3/0659 (US);
G06F3/067 (US);
H04L63/0428 (EP);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L63/20 (EP);
H04L67/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | BESCHLEUNIGERSYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT SICHERER DATENSPEICHERUNG | [2013/15] | English: | ACCELERATOR SYSTEM FOR USE WITH SECURE DATA STORAGE | [2013/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ACCÉLÉRATEUR DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES SÉCURISÉ | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 26.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006177061 (ORSINI RICK L [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * abstract * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0127] * * figures 6, 7 *; | [X]US2006015945 (FIELDS DANIEL M [US]) [X] 1,10,13,20,24 * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0149] *; | [X]US2002080888 (SHU LI [US], et al) [X] 1,10,13,20,24 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0089] * | Examination | - Intel, "The 8086 Family User's Manual", The 8086 Family User's Manual, (19790101), pages B - 46, XP055340209 | - Andrew S Tanenbaum, "Structured Computer Organization, 4th Edition.", Structured Computer Organization, 4th Edition., Upper Saddle River, NJ, US, Prentice Hall, (19990101), pages 356 - 359, ISBN 978-0-13-020435-6, XP055340219 | by applicant | US7391865 | US7856545 | US7856546 | US20110349560 | US20050258839 | US19670116026 | US19550119833 | US19750119995 | US19650121483 | US20030122097 | US19970123498 | US19760127832 | US19770129538 | US19970926277 | US20000558634 | US19990435011 | US20000477943 |