EP2521797 - DNA METHYLATION BIOMARKERS OF LUNG FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lineagen, Inc. 423 Wakara Way, Suite 200 Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURRELLE, Edward, L. 14730 Rolling Spring Drive Midlothian, VA 23114-4373 / US | 02 /
ZEDLER, Barbara, K. Venebio, LLC Virginia Biotechnology Research Park 7400 Beaufont Springs Drive, Suite 300 Richmond, VA 23225 / US | 03 /
JOYCE, Andrew, R. Venebio, LLC Virginia Biotechnology Research Park 7400 Beaufont Springs Drive, Suite 300 Richmond, VA 23225 / US | 04 /
VAN DEN OORD, Edwin J.C.G. School of Pharmacy Virginia Commonwealth University McGuire Hall, Room 216A P.O. Box 980533 Richmond, VA 23298-0581 / US | 05 /
SENGUPTA, Tapas, K. 5580 Port Royal Road Springfield, VA 22151 / US | 06 /
MENG, Hailong 6 Birch Road Woodbridge, CT 06525 / US | 07 /
ADKINS, Daniel, E. Dept of Pharmacotherapy & Outcomes Science Center for Biomarker Res. & Person. Med. 1112 East Clay Street McGuire Hall, P.O. Box 980533 Richmond, VA 23298 / US | [2012/48] |
Former [2012/46] | 01 /
MURRELLE, Edward, L. 14730 Rolling Spring Drive Midlothian, VA 23114-4373 / US | ||
02 /
ZEDLER, Barbara, K. Venebio, LLC Virginia Biotechnology Research Park 7400 Beaufont Springs Drive, Suite 300 Richmond, VA 23225 / US | |||
03 /
JOYCE, Andrew, R. Venebio, LLC Virginia Biotechnology Research Park 7400 Beaufont Springs Drive, Suite 300 Richmond, VA 23225 / US | |||
04 /
VAN DEN OORD, Edwin J.C.G. School of Pharmacy Virginia Commonwealth University McGuire Hall, Room 216A P.O. Box 980533 Richmond, VA 23298-0581 / US | |||
05 /
SENGUPTA, Tapas, K. 5580 Port Royal Road Springfield, VA 22151 / US | |||
06 /
MENG, Hailong Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center 415 East 68th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | |||
07 /
ADKINS, Daniel, E. Dept of Pharmacotherapy & Outcomes Science Center for Biomarker Res. & Person. Med. 1112 East Clay Street McGuire Hall, P.O. Box 980533 Richmond, VA 23298 / US | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Bohmann, Armin K. bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 1 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11728576.7 | 04.01.2011 | WO2011US20152 | Priority number, date | US20100292153P | 04.01.2010 Original published format: US 292153 P | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011082436 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2521797 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | DNA-METHYLIERUNGS-BIOMARKER FÜR DIE LUNGENFUNKTION | [2012/46] | English: | DNA METHYLATION BIOMARKERS OF LUNG FUNCTION | [2012/46] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS DE MÉTHYLATION D'ADN DE LA FONCTION PULMONAIRE | [2012/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 17.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2014 | 31.01.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2007231797 (FAN JIAN-BING [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,13,15,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053] *[A] 6,14; | [A] - MAKOTO SUZUKI ET AL, "Molecular Characterization of Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease-Related Non-Small Cell Lung Cancer Through Aberrant Methylation and Alterations of EGFR Signaling", ANNALS OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20091016), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 1534-4681, pages 878 - 888, XP019765752 [A] 1-10,13-16 * abstract * | [A] - TSOU ET AL, "DNA methylation profile of 28 potential marker loci in malignant mesothelioma", LUNG CANCER, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071006), vol. 58, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.LUNGCAN.2007.06.015, ISSN 0169-5002, pages 220 - 230, XP022288740 [A] 1-10,13-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lungcan.2007.06.015 | [T] - WEILIANG QIU ET AL, "Variable DNA Methylation Is Associated with Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease and Lung Function", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (20120215), vol. 185, no. 4, doi:10.1164/rccm.201108-1382OC, ISSN 1073-449X, pages 373 - 381, XP055063168 [T] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/rccm.201108-1382OC | International search | [X]US2007231797 (FAN JIAN-BING [US], et al); | [Y]US2008241842 (BELINSKY STEVEN A [US]); | [Y] - BHATTACHARYA ET AL., "Molecular biomarkers for quantitative and discrete COPD phenotypes.", AMER J RESPIR CELL MOL BIO, (200903), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 359 - 367, XP008165045 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1165/rcmb.2008-0114OC |