EP2569733 - INTEGRATED MODULAR ACTIVE SAFETY SYSTEM BASED ON ACTIVE DUAL-FREQUENCY RFID DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Microwave Engineering S.R.L. Via del Monasteraccio, 4 50143 Firenze / IT | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALVADOR, Claudio Via dei Ciliegi 12 I-50018 Scandicci / IT | 02 /
BONIFACIO, Filippo Via F. Bonaini 26 I-50134 Firenze / IT | 03 /
SALVINI, Marco Via Cesare Battisti 2 I-57025 Piombino / IT | 04 /
ZANI, Filippo Via dei Girasoli 49 I-50054 Fucecchio / IT | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2013/12] | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11728669.0 | 13.05.2011 | WO2011IB52114 | Priority number, date | IT2010FI00105 | 14.05.2010 Original published format: IT FI20100105 | [2013/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011141897 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2569733 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2569733 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00, H04L12/28 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
G06K19/0724 (EP,US);
G06K7/10237 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES MODULARES AKTIVES SICHERHEITSSYSTEM AUF DER BASIS VON AKTIVEN DOPPELFREQUENZ-RFID-VORRICHTUNGEN | [2013/12] | English: | INTEGRATED MODULAR ACTIVE SAFETY SYSTEM BASED ON ACTIVE DUAL-FREQUENCY RFID DEVICES | [2013/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SÉCURITÉ ACTIVE MODULAIRE INTÉGRÉ À BASE DE DISPOSITIFS RFID ACTIFS BI-FRÉQUENCE | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 25.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 11.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 11.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.2013 | 31.05.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.10.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2011 | AL | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | CZ | 03.12.2014 | DK | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | HR | 03.12.2014 | IT | 03.12.2014 | LT | 03.12.2014 | LV | 03.12.2014 | MC | 03.12.2014 | MK | 03.12.2014 | MT | 03.12.2014 | PL | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | RS | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | SM | 03.12.2014 | TR | 03.12.2014 | NO | 03.03.2015 | GR | 04.03.2015 | IS | 03.04.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | IE | 13.05.2015 | LU | 13.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.05.2011 | |
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MK | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
TR | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 13.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 13.05.2011 | |
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
TR | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 13.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 13.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 13.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 03.12.2014 | |
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 03.12.2014 | |
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 03.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5874724 (CATO ROBERT THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 40 *; | [AD]EP1209615 (ADVANCED MICROWAVE ENGINEERING [IT]) [AD] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]US2005058102 (SANTHOFF JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0060] *; | [A]WO2006102538 (AWARE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 6, line 10 - page 6, line 31 *; | [A]US2007115125 (LYON GEOFF [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0026] * | by applicant | EP1209615 |