EP2588190 - RHYTHM CORRELATION DIAGNOSTIC MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul, MN 55112-5798 / US | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERLE, LeAnne, M. 14 Echo Lake BLVD Mahtomedi MN 55115 / US | 02 /
PERSCHBACHER, David, L. 1986 - 128th Avenue NW Coon Rapids MN 55448 / US | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Joachimstaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11728742.5 | 22.06.2011 | WO2011US41381 | Priority number, date | US20100360740P | 01.07.2010 Original published format: US 360740 P | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012003122 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588190 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/37, A61N1/372, A61B5/0452, A61B5/046, A61B5/0464, A61N1/39 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A61N1/3702 (EP,US);
A61B5/35 (EP,US);
A61B5/363 (EP,US);
A61B5/7246 (EP,US);
A61B5/7445 (EP,US);
A61N1/37247 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTISCHE MESSUNG VON RHYTHMUSKORRELATION | [2013/19] | English: | RHYTHM CORRELATION DIAGNOSTIC MEASUREMENT | [2013/19] | French: | MESURE DIAGNOSTIQUE DE MISE EN CORRÉLATION DE RYTHME | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 27.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004019287 (WHITE HARLEY [US]) [X] 1,2,5-12 * paragraphs [0034] - [0061]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4; | [X]US2009240300 (LIAN JIE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0124] - [0134]; figures 7-8 *; | [X]US2006161069 (LI DAN [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0053] - [0064] - [0112] - [0117]; figures 1-3, 21-24 *; | [X]US2007010753 (MACADAM DAVID P [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0047] - [0057]; figures 4, 5, 8 *; | [Y]WO2006039694 (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]) [Y] 3,4 * page 27, line 24 - page 28, line 5; figure 6 * * page 42, line 21 - page 43, line 15; figure 14 * * page 60, line 1 - page 61, line 9; figure 24 * | Examination | US2007276276 | by applicant | US6708058 | US7664553 | US6493579 | US20110360740 | US20050054726 |