EP2727234 - CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2016/15] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAINER, David Reginald 45 Brackens Lane Alvaston Derbyshire DE24 0AQ / GB | 02 /
GREEN, Timothy Charles 5 Newlands Balcombe Haywards Heath Sussex RH17 6HX / GB | 03 /
MERLIN, Michael Marc Claude 28 rue de l'Orge F-91410 Dourdan / FR | 04 /
SOTO-SANCHEZ, Diego 122 Huntingdon Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0HL / GB | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Philippe, et al Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 Bis Esplanade de La Défense CS 60347 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Ahner, Philippe, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2014/19] | Ahner, Philippe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11728832.4 | 29.06.2011 | [2016/37] | WO2011EP60907 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013000510 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2727234 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2727234 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/49, H02J3/18, H02J3/36 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
H02J3/36 (EP,US);
H02M1/14 (KR);
H02J3/18 (EP,KR,US);
H02M7/4835 (EP,US);
H02M7/49 (EP,KR,US);
H02J2003/365 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | H02M7/49, H02J3/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WANDLER | [2014/19] | English: | CONVERTER | [2014/19] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 06.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2011 | AL | 14.09.2016 | AT | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | RS | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
AL | 14.09.2016 | ||
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
AL | 14.09.2016 | ||
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
AL | 14.09.2016 | ||
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.09.2016 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008310205 (HILLER MARC [DE]) [A] 1-27 * abstract ** figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2010118578 (DOMMASCHK MIKE [DE], et al) [X] 1-27 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0 22] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] * * claim 6 * * figures 1, 2, 5, 6 *; | [A]WO2010145689 (AREVA T & D UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 13, line 9 - line 23 * * figures 4, 7, 8 *; | [A]WO2011012171 (AREVA T & D UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 29 * * figures 5a, 6, 8 * |