EP2571954 - HEAT TRANSFER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V. Eje 106 Zona Industrial C.P. 78395 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX | [2015/22] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V. Rio San Javier No. 10 Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio Tlalnepantla Eastado de Mexico c.p. 54060 / MX | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOW, Robert, E. Mexichem UK Limited P.O. Box 13 The Heath Runcorn, Cheshire WA7 4QF / GB | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/13] | Pugh, Robert Ian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 11728909.0 | 20.05.2011 | [2016/01] | WO2011GB00769 | Priority number, date | GB20110002556 | 14.02.2011 Original published format: GB 201102556 | GB20100020624 | 06.12.2010 Original published format: GB 201020624 | GB20100010057 | 16.06.2010 Original published format: GB 201010057 | GB20100008438 | 20.05.2010 Original published format: GB 201008438 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011144906 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2571954 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2571954 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/30, C09K5/04 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,KR,US);
C09K3/30 (EP,KR,US);
B01D11/0288 (US);
B01D11/0492 (US);
C02F1/26 (US);
C08J9/122 (US);
C08J9/127 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/146 (US);
C08L23/10 (KR);
C08L25/06 (KR);
C08L53/00 (KR);
C08L71/02 (KR);
C08L77/12 (KR);
C09K23/007 (US);
C09K5/041 (EP,US);
C09K5/044 (EP,KR,US);
C11D7/5018 (EP,KR,US);
F01K25/08 (KR,US);
F25B13/00 (US);
F25B30/02 (KR,US);
F25B45/00 (KR,US);
F28D15/02 (KR,US);
F28D5/00 (US);
C08G2261/126 (KR);
C08J2203/06 (EP,US);
C08J2203/14 (EP,US);
C08J2203/142 (EP,US);
C08J2207/04 (EP,US);
C08J2325/06 (US);
C08J2363/00 (US);
C08J2375/00 (US);
C08L2201/04 (KR);
C09K2205/106 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2205/12 (EP,US);
C09K2205/122 (US);
C09K2205/126 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2013/13] | English: | HEAT TRANSFER COMPOSITIONS | [2013/13] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE TRANSMISSION DE CHALEUR | [2013/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 22.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2011 | AL | 30.12.2015 | AT | 30.12.2015 | BE | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | IE | 20.05.2016 | LU | 20.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009253820 (BOWMAN JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1-14,16-23,26,28,29,36-39,52-58,62 * paragraphs [0030] - [0046] - [0050] , [0053] , [0054] , [0059] , [0126] - [0144] - [0151] , [0154] - [0160] * [I] 1-62; | [XI]US2010025619 (RIVA MARCELLO [DE], et al) [X] 1-11,16-42,47-62 * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] - [0016] , [0019] , [0021] , [0024] , [0025] , [0086] , [0096] , [0099] , [0102] , [0103]; example 2; table 4 * [I] 16-62; | [XI]US2006043331 (SHANKLAND IAN [US], et al) [X] 1-11,16-23,28,30-36,38-42,49-54,58-62 * paragraphs [0004] , [0012] , [0025] - [0043] - [0046] - [0048] - [0050] - [0051] - [0056] - [0072] - [0078] , [0083] , [0087] , [0089] * [I] 16-62; | [A]EP1832640 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-62 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] , [0020] *; | [A]US2008099190 (SINGH RAJIV R [US], et al) [A] 1-62 * paragraphs [0001] , [0024] - [0039] - [0046] - [0060] - [0063] - [0068] - [0072] , [0074] , [0076] - [0106] * * paragraphs [0111] , [0119] , [0121] , [0125] , [0131] , [0135] , [0138] - [0141] , [0143]; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US2010044619 (HULSE RYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-62 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0018] - [0032] - [0035] , [0040] - [0044] - [0050] - [0052] - [0087]; figures 2,4; examples 2,4 *; | [XPI]WO2010088320 (ARKEMA INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-11,16-23,26,28,29,36-39 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 7 * * page 5, line 6 - page 7, line 8; example 9 * [I] 15-62 | by applicant | WO2007053697 | - TAKIZAWA ET AL., "Reaction Stoichiometry for Combustion of Fluoroethane Blends", ASHRAE TRANSACTIONS, (2006), vol. 112, no. 2 | - R. AKASAKA, JOURNAL OF THERMAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 159 - 168 |