EP2593734 - NO-FROST REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/21] | IMPROVED NO-FROST REFRIGERATOR | ||
[2013/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.P. Industries S.P.A. 284, Via Dante 60044 Fabriano (Ancona) / IT | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCOLINI, Gianluca ANTONIOMERLONI S.P.A. in A.S. 116 Via Vittorio Veneto I-60044 Fabriano (ANCONA) / IT | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Premru, Rok c/o Mar.Bre S.r.l. Via San Filippo, 2 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Premru, Rok C/o Mar.Bre S.R.L. 2, Via San Filippo 60044 Fabriano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11728937.1 | 14.06.2011 | WO2011IB01358 | Priority number, date | IT2010AN00115 | 12.07.2010 Original published format: IT AN20100115 | [2013/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012007806 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2593734 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2593734 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F25D21/14, F25D17/04, F25D17/06 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
F25D17/065 (EP);
F25D17/042 (EP);
F25D21/14 (EP);
F25D17/067 (EP);
F25D2317/0413 (EP);
F25D2317/0683 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/21] | F25D17/06, F25D17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NO-FROST-KÜHLSCHRANK | [2013/51] | English: | NO-FROST REFRIGERATOR | [2013/51] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR SANS GIVRE | [2013/51] |
Former [2013/21] | VERBESSERTER NO-FROST-KÜHLSCHRANK | ||
Former [2013/21] | IMPROVED NO-FROST REFRIGERATOR | ||
Former [2013/21] | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR AMÉLIORÉ SANS FORMATION DE GIVRE | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 23.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2011 | AL | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MK | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | RS | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | SM | 14.05.2014 | IE | 14.06.2014 | LU | 14.06.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MK | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
IE | 14.06.2014 | ||
LU | 14.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
IE | 14.06.2014 | ||
LU | 14.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
IE | 14.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BE | 14.05.2014 | |
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
IE | 14.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | BE | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
IE | 14.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | BE | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
IE | 14.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | BE | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
IE | 14.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | BE | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
IE | 14.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | BE | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
IE | 14.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | BE | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | BE | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | BE | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | BE | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4272969 (SCHWITZGEBEL FERNAND) [AD] 1-12 * column 4, line 44 - column 5; figures 1-6; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US3455119 (BRIGHT JAMES A) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 23; figures 1,3, 6; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9314360 (AAS KETIL [NO]) [A] 1-12 * page 3 - page 4; figures 1-2d; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US4075866 (WILLIAMITIS VICTOR A) [A] 1-12 * column 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH02238280 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0336810 (SELNOR [FR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | IT1104915 |