EP2566550 - INHALER WHICH CREATES TURBULANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sima Patent ve Lisanslama Hizmetleri Ltd.Sti. Yildiz Teknik Üniversitesi Davutpasa Kampüsü Teknoloji Gelistirme Bölgesi D Blok K:3 Esenler/Istanbul / TR | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Bilgic, Mahmut Yildiz Teknik Universitesi Davutpasa Kampusu Teknoloji Gelistirme Bolgesi D Blok 34220 Esenler-Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/11] | Application number, filing date | 11728969.4 | 13.04.2011 | WO2011TR00090 | Priority number, date | TR20100004317 | 28.05.2010 Original published format: TR 201004317 | TR20100003091 | 20.04.2010 Original published format: TR 201003091 | TR20100002877 | 13.04.2010 Original published format: TR 201002877 | [2013/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011129790 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2566550 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
A61M15/0045 (EP);
A61M15/0021 (EP);
A61M15/0026 (EP);
A61M15/0043 (EP);
A61M15/0051 (EP);
A61M15/0055 (EP);
A61M15/0075 (EP);
A61M15/0081 (EP);
A61M2202/062 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Title | German: | INHALATOR, DER TURBULENZ ERZEUGT | [2013/11] | English: | INHALER WHICH CREATES TURBULANCE | [2013/11] | French: | INHALATEUR CRÉANT UNE TURBULENCE | [2013/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 03.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2407042 (VECTURA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-29 * pages 1-23; figures 1-19 *; | [I]WO2006066908 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-29 * pages 1-51; figures 1-17 *; | [I]US2008308102 (DAVIES MICHAEL BIRSHA [GB], et al) [I] 1-29 * paragraphs [0001] - [0264]; figures 1-17c *; | [A]EP2082764 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-29* paragraphs [0001] - [0094]; figures 1-6 * |