Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011133956 | ![]() | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32704010 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011133953 | ![]() | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011133951 | ![]() | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010048526 | ![]() | 16.09.2010 | A3 | WO2010048526 | 29.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021238158 | ![]() | 05.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US201514687286 | 15.04.2015 | US201816059724 | 09.08.2018 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US201313642642 | 14.08.2013 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US202017003051 | 26.08.2020 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019210991 | ![]() | 11.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US201514687286 | 15.04.2015 | US201816059724 | 09.08.2018 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US201313642642 | 14.08.2013 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019038615 | ![]() | 07.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213657321 | 22.10.2012 | US201715643182 | 06.07.2017 | US201815898683 | 19.02.2018 | US201514603779 | 23.01.2015 | WO2011US33687 | 22.04.2011 | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018153874 | ![]() | 07.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213657321 | 22.10.2012 | US201715643182 | 06.07.2017 | US201514603779 | 23.01.2015 | WO2011US33687 | 22.04.2011 | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016022665 | ![]() | 28.01.2016 | A2 | US2015164883 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514630778 | 25.02.2015 | US201213657345 | 22.10.2012 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33689 | 22.04.2011 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016022664 | ![]() | 28.01.2016 | A2 | US2015164881 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US201514629097 | 23.02.2015 | US201213657299 | 22.10.2012 | WO2011US33693 | 22.04.2011 | US32704010 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016067239 | ![]() | 10.03.2016 | A9 | US2015141459 | 21.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213657321 | 22.10.2012 | US201514603779 | 23.01.2015 | WO2011US33687 | 22.04.2011 | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014303204 | ![]() | 09.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | US60505309 | 23.10.2009 | US201414298245 | 06.06.2014 | US201313944171 | 17.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9035072 | ![]() | 19.05.2015 | B2 | US2013324743 | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US201113642642 | 21.04.2011 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8785640 | ![]() | 22.07.2014 | B2 | US2013303570 | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | US60505309 | 23.10.2009 | US201313944171 | 17.07.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013158071 | ![]() | 20.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US201213657299 | 22.10.2012 | WO2011US33693 | 22.04.2011 | US32704010 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013338188 | ![]() | 19.12.2013 | A9 | US2013143919 | 06.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213657321 | 22.10.2012 | WO2011US33687 | 22.04.2011 | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013131107 | ![]() | 23.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213657345 | 22.10.2012 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33689 | 22.04.2011 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8598205 | ![]() | 03.12.2013 | B2 | US2012208841 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | US60505309 | 23.10.2009 | US201213439379 | 04.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011257223 | ![]() | 20.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | US201113092838 | 22.04.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8513282 | ![]() | 20.08.2013 | B2 | US2010113508 | 06.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | US60505309 | 23.10.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10071979 | ![]() | 11.09.2018 | B2 | US2015218122 | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US201514687286 | 15.04.2015 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US201313642642 | 14.08.2013 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190061096 | ![]() | 04.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130056244 | ![]() | 29.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110074917 | ![]() | 04.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101984225B | ![]() | 30.05.2019 | B1 | KR20160045943 | 27.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013525371 | ![]() | 20.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5645833B | ![]() | 24.12.2014 | B2 | JP2012506866 | 22.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL268953 | ![]() | 31.05.2020 | B | IL268953 | 31.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL236209 | ![]() | 26.09.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3381899 | ![]() | 06.01.2021 | B1 | EP3381899 | 03.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | EP11729195 | 21.04.2011 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | EP16154612 | 21.04.2011 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3138563 | ![]() | 08.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | EP11718596 | 22.04.2011 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3045452 | ![]() | 20.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | EP11729195 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2560651 | ![]() | 27.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | WO2011US33693 | 22.04.2011 | US32704010 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2560650 | ![]() | 27.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33689 | 22.04.2011 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2560649 | ![]() | 27.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US33687 | 22.04.2011 | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2349263 | ![]() | 23.04.2014 | B1 | EP2349263 | 03.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105130948 | ![]() | 09.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | CN201180031319 | 21.04.2011 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103038214B | ![]() | 30.09.2015 | B | CN103038214 | 10.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2797118 | ![]() | 30.03.2021 | C | CA2797118 | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018226453B | ![]() | 11.07.2019 | B2 | AU2018226453 | 27.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2011242452 | 22.04.2011 | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | AU2018226453 | 06.09.2018 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | AU2016259327 | 15.11.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016259327 | ![]() | 01.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2011242452 | 22.04.2011 | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | AU2016259327 | 15.11.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016202569B | ![]() | 04.01.2018 | B2 | AU2016202569 | 19.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | AU2016202569 | 22.04.2016 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | AU2011242712 | 21.04.2011 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011242712B | ![]() | 28.01.2016 | B2 | AU2011242712 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011242457 | ![]() | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | WO2011US33693 | 22.04.2011 | US32704010 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011242454 | ![]() | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33689 | 22.04.2011 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011242452 | ![]() | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US33687 | 22.04.2011 | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009308284B | ![]() | 04.02.2016 | B2 | AU2009308284 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2560954 | ![]() | 05.10.2016 | B1 | EP2560954 | 27.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR074060 | 22.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR080944 | 16.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR117395 | 04.08.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012027056 | 08.09.2021 | B8 | BR112012027056 | 24.08.2021 | B1 | BR112012027056 | 08.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0919930 | 16.02.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2741718 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2796602 | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33689 | 22.04.2011 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2796642 | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US33687 | 22.04.2011 | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2796646 | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | WO2011US33693 | 22.04.2011 | US32704010 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3108488 | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | CA2797118 | 21.04.2011 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2011000919 | 06.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102227424B | 14.08.2013 | B | CN102227424 | 26.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1115369T | 04.01.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | EP09822784 | 23.10.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2349263T | 21.07.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA018891 | 29.11.2013 | B1 | EA201170601 | 30.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2483690T | 07.08.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2608474T | 11.04.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1161259 | 24.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20140695T | 10.10.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011004375 | 07.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012012204 | 05.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX342288 | 23.09.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX353408 | 11.01.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ592685 | 26.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ603042 | 27.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011US33687 | 22.04.2011 | US32707810 | 22.04.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ603043 | 27.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33689 | 22.04.2011 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ603044 | 28.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | WO2011US33693 | 22.04.2011 | US32704010 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ603721 | 28.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ717669 | 29.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ62900011 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ734535 | 31.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | NZ71766911 | 21.04.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2349263T | 28.11.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | EP09822784 | 23.10.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2349263E | 28.07.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS53460 | 31.12.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2569678 | 27.11.2015 | C2 | RU2012149691 | 27.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG184987 | 29.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | WO2011US33396 | 21.04.2011 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2349263T | 30.09.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | EP09822784 | 23.10.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201400124B | 10.11.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI465449B | 21.12.2014 | B | TW201028423 | 01.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI515192B | 01.01.2016 | B | TW201204720 | 01.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA104601 | 25.02.2014 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201102900 | 25.07.2012 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2009US61882 | 23.10.2009 | US10783008 | 23.10.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011133751 | ![]() | 16.02.2012 | A9 | WO2011133751 | 12.01.2012 | A3 | WO2011133751 | 27.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6714673B | ![]() | 24.06.2020 | B2 | JP2019031570 | 28.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6484652B | ![]() | 13.03.2019 | B2 | JP2017071650 | 13.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015166382 | ![]() | 24.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR081333 | 08.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2858351T | 30.09.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1218419 | 17.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1225721 | 15.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2745977 | 05.04.2021 | C2 | RU2015145784 | 29.04.2019 | A3 | RU2015145784 | 11.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201505700Q | 28.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201913594U | 27.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI518082B | 21.01.2016 | B | TW201204715 | 01.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI561518B | 11.12.2016 | B | TW201612173 | 01.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI620744B | 11.04.2018 | B | TW201636337 | 16.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US32709510 | 22.04.2010 | US32949310 | 29.04.2010 | US32709910 | 22.04.2010 | US33387010 | 12.05.2010 | US32709110 | 22.04.2010 | US32705710 | 22.04.2010 | US32950010 | 29.04.2010 | US32951010 | 29.04.2010 | Type | ![]() | EP3045452 | EP3381899 |