EP2585651 - AUTOMATIC POOL CLEANERS AND COMPONENTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zodiac Pool Systems, Inc. 2620 Commerce Way Vista, CA 92081 / US | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Zodiac Pool Care Europe 32 bis boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Zodiac Pool Care Europe 32 Bis Boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER MEIJDEN, Hendrikus, Johannes 58 Rosies Road 1685 Glen Austin Midrand / ZA | 02 /
BAUCKMAN, Mark 978 Pippin Ct. San Marcos CA 92078 / US | 03 /
KLIMAS, David, Andrew 620 Rainbow Place Escondido CA 92027 / US | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/18] | 01 /
VAN DER MEIJDEN, Hendrikus, Johannes 58 Rosies Road 1685 Glen Austin Midrand / ZA | ||
02 /
BAUCKMAN, Mark 978 Pippin Ct. San Marcos CA 92078 / US | |||
03 /
KLIMAS, David, Andrew 16315 Bassett Street Ramona CA 92065 / US | Representative(s) | Pavageau, Sabrina, et al Ipside 6 impasse Michel Labrousse 31100 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Pavageau, Sabrina, et al Schmit-Chrétien SAS Parc de Basso Cambo 4, rue Paul Mesplé 31100 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2013/18] | Cabinet BARRE LAFORGUE & associés 35, rue Lancefoc 31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 11729502.2 | 14.06.2011 | WO2011US40248 | Priority number, date | US20100398592P | 28.06.2010 Original published format: US 398592 P | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012009081 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2585651 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2585651 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04H4/16 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
E04H4/1654 (EP,US);
E04H4/1663 (US);
B08B1/165 (US);
B08B1/32 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE POOLREINIGER UND BESTANDTEILE | [2013/18] | English: | AUTOMATIC POOL CLEANERS AND COMPONENTS THEREOF | [2013/18] | French: | APPAREILS DE NETTOYAGE DE PISCINE AUTOMATIQUES ET LEURS COMPOSANTS | [2013/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 03.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2011 | AL | 13.08.2014 | AT | 13.08.2014 | BE | 13.08.2014 | CY | 13.08.2014 | CZ | 13.08.2014 | DK | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | FI | 13.08.2014 | HR | 13.08.2014 | IT | 13.08.2014 | LT | 13.08.2014 | LV | 13.08.2014 | MC | 13.08.2014 | MK | 13.08.2014 | MT | 13.08.2014 | NL | 13.08.2014 | PL | 13.08.2014 | RO | 13.08.2014 | RS | 13.08.2014 | SE | 13.08.2014 | SI | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | SM | 13.08.2014 | TR | 13.08.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | NO | 13.11.2014 | GR | 14.11.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | PT | 15.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
AT | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MK | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
AT | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 13.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4154680 (SOMMER PETER [CH]) [A] 1,6,8* column 2, line 17 - line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]US2009307854 (GARTI EFRAIM [IL]) [Y] 3 * page 2, column r, paragraph 52 - paragraph 53; figures 1A-1D * [A] 1,2,6-8; | [XY]US2010122422 (HUI WING-KIN [HK]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * page 2, column l, paragraph 33 - column r, paragraph 46; figures 1,2,8 * [Y] 3 | by applicant | US4449265 | US6292970 | US2010119358 |