EP2593649 - METHOD AND CONTROL UNIT FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÜLE, Harry Am Wanderweg 19 92431 Neunburg V. Wald / DE | 02 /
STUTIKA, Markus Vintlweg 2 93053 Regensburg / DE | [2013/21] | Application number, filing date | 11729631.9 | 05.07.2011 | WO2011EP61331 | Priority number, date | DE20101027214 | 15.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010027214 | [2013/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012007323 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2593649 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02D13/02, F02D41/34 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
F02D13/0226 (EP,KR,US);
F02D41/345 (EP,KR,US);
F02D41/30 (KR,US);
F02D35/023 (EP,KR,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,KR,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND STEUERGERÄT ZUM STEUERN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2013/21] | English: | METHOD AND CONTROL UNIT FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2013/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 21.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/40] | 19.05.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1338778 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0049] - [0078] *; | [Y]WO2004048761 (RICARDO CONSULTING ENG [GB], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 21, line 1 - page 22, line 1 *; | [A]EP0459946 (KISTLER INSTRUMENTE AG [CH]) [A] 1,7 * figures 10,12 * * column 6, lines 3-30 *; | [A]DE102008004442 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004023589 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [AD]DE10056862 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10056862 |