EP2611982 - DRILL PIPE PROTECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/28] | PROTECTOR FOR AN OIL EXTRACTION PIPE | ||
[2019/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Premium Protector 3 rue des Paradoux 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROUIN, Alexis 3 rue des Paradoux F-31000 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
CHARRUE, Thomas 54 rue de Montbazon 37260 Monts / FR | 03 /
CHOFFART, Philippe 116 rue du Général Renault F-37000 Tours / FR | [2020/14] |
Former [2013/37] | 01 /
DROUIN, Alexis 3 rue des Paradoux F-31000 Toulouse / FR | ||
02 /
CHARRUE, Thomas 54 rue de Montbazon F-37260 Monts / FR | |||
03 /
CHOFFART, Philippe 116 rue du Général Renault F-37000 Tours / FR | |||
Former [2013/28] | 01 /
DROUIN, Alexis 3 rue des Paradoux F-31000 Toulouse / FR | ||
02 /
CHARRUE, Thomas 51 rue de la Grève F-41100 Vendome / FR | |||
03 /
CHOFFART, Philippe 116 rue du Général Renault F-37000 Tours / FR | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/28] | Texier, Christian Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11730032.7 | 08.07.2011 | [2020/14] | WO2011EP61703 | Priority number, date | FR20100061379 | 30.12.2010 Original published format: FR 1061379 | FR20100057020 | 03.09.2010 Original published format: FR 1057020 | [2013/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012028365 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611982 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611982 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/00, B65D59/06, F16L57/00 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
B65D59/06 (EP,US);
F16L57/00 (US);
E21B17/006 (EP,US);
F16L57/005 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRGESTÄNGESCHUTZ | [2019/18] | English: | DRILL PIPE PROTECTOR | [2019/18] | French: | PROTECTEUR DE TUBE D'EXTRACTION DE PÉTROLE | [2013/28] |
Former [2013/28] | SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ÖLEXTRAKTIONSROHR | ||
Former [2013/28] | PROTECTOR FOR AN OIL EXTRACTION PIPE | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 21.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2011 | AL | 01.04.2020 | AT | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IE | 08.07.2020 | LU | 08.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.07.2011 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IE | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IE | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IE | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4157100 (TURK JOHN [US]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 21 - line 28 *; | [A]US4379471 (KUENZEL RAINER [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]US4662402 (DREYFUSS WILFRIED [DE], et al) [Y] 7 * column 4, line 42 - line 46 *; | [IY]US6196270 (RICHARDS DARRELL R [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * column 15, line 36 - line 65 * [Y] 3,7 | Examination | US4157100 | US4379471 | US4662402 | US6196270 |