|
15.02.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
25.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
07.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.09.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
21.11.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
17 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |