08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
12.02.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
28.02.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
25.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.02.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.10.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.09.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
12.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.05.2019 |
Change - inventor |
|
29.03.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
29.03.2019 |
Change - English title |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
10.12.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.08.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2018 |
First examination report |
|
14.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
22.10.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.10.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
09.08.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
04.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
07.06.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
27.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|