Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9151433 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2015 | B2 | US2013299037 | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP61703 | 08.07.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10066777 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2018 | B2 | US2013213517 | 22.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP65140 | 01.09.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5883870B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2016 | B2 | JP2013542346 | 21.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP65140 | 01.09.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5845262B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B2 | JP2013536906 | 26.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP61703 | 08.07.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2611983 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2015 | B1 | EP2611983 | 10.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP65140 | 01.09.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103210173B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2016 | B | CN103210173 | 17.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP61703 | 08.07.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103180538B | Global Dossier | 20.07.2016 | B | CN103180538 | 26.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP65140 | 01.09.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2611982 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2020 | B1 | EP2611982 | 10.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP61703 | 08.07.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013005039 | 31.05.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP61703 | 08.07.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013005040 | 08.12.2020 | B1 | BR112013005040 | 31.05.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP65140 | 01.09.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA028276 | 31.10.2017 | B1 | EA201390297 | 30.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP61703 | 08.07.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA030163 | 29.06.2018 | B1 | EA201390298 | 30.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP65140 | 01.09.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2547437T | 06.10.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP65140 | 01.09.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2806254T | 17.02.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP61703 | 08.07.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2964408 | 03.05.2013 | B1 | FR2964408 | 09.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX337435 | 03.03.2016 | B | MX2013002494 | 28.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP61703 | 08.07.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2013002496 | 28.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP65140 | 01.09.2011 | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012028692 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012028365 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2964409 | 28.06.2013 | B1 | FR2964409 | 09.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1061379 | 30.12.2010 | FR1057020 | 03.09.2010 |