EP2558936 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EXCLUDING SERVING AN ADVERTISEMENT CAMPAIGN TO UNDESIRED WEB PAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vibrant Media, Inc. 565 5th Avenue 15th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOIG, Toby c/o Vibrant Media Inc. 565 5th Avenue 15th Floor New York, New York 10017 / US | 02 /
GOODING, Craig Allen c/o Vibrant Media Inc. 565 5th Avenue 15th Floor New York, New York 10017 / US | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cooper, John Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11730117.6 | 13.04.2011 | WO2011US32334 | Priority number, date | US20100762125 | 16.04.2010 Original published format: US 762125 | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011130418 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2558936 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06Q30/02 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0241 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN AUSSCHLUSS DER BEREITSTELLUNG EINER WERBEKAMPAGNE AN UNERWÜNSCHTE WEBSEITEN | [2013/08] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EXCLUDING SERVING AN ADVERTISEMENT CAMPAIGN TO UNDESIRED WEB PAGES | [2013/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR EXCLURE LA DIFFUSION D'UNE CAMPAGNE PUBLICITAIRE SUR DES PAGES WEB INDÉSIRABLES | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 05.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2014 | 30.04.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - "STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NOTICE FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007 CONCERNING BUSINESS METHODS - EPC / ERKLAERUNG GEMAESS DER MITTEILUNG DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS VOM 1.OKTOBER 2007 UEBER GESCHAEFTSMETHODEN - EPU / DECLARATION CONFORMEMENT AU COMMUNIQUE DE L'OFFICE EUROP", 20071101, (20071101), XP007905525 [L] 1-12 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods(OJ 11/2007; p592-593) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | International search | [Y]US2007078963 (WOODARD SCOTT E [US], et al); | [Y]US2008082400 (MARTEL MARK [US], et al); | [A]US2009254568 (VIGNISSON VIDAR [US], et al); | [A]US2010010898 (MATSUMOTO HIDETO [JP]); | [A]US2010094976 (KANEFSKY STEVEN T [US], et al) |