EP2582595 - PACK FOR CIGARETTES AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSE, Henry Dreessel Nr. 8 27374 Visselhövede / DE | 02 /
HEIN, Viktor Bürgermeister-Hogrefe-Strasse 12 27308 Kirchlinteln-Luttum / DE | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Ellberg, Nils Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Ellberg, Nils Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11730187.9 | 13.05.2011 | WO2011EP02372 | Priority number, date | DE20101023753 | 15.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010023753 | [2013/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011157332 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2582595 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/10, B65B41/12, B65B19/22 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
B65D85/1009 (EP);
B65B19/223 (EP);
B65D75/5838 (EP);
B65D75/5894 (EP);
B65D85/1036 (EP);
B65D85/1072 (EP);
B65D2575/586 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | PACKUNG FÜR ZIGARETTEN SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [2013/17] | English: | PACK FOR CIGARETTES AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2013/17] | French: | EMBALLAGE DE CIGARETTES, ET PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'UN TEL EMBALLAGE | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 24.02.2014 | Observations by third parties | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/26] | 19.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2260758 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1,12,14* page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 18; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO0194238 (GD SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,12-14 * page 4, lines 8-21; figures 1-8 *; | [X]WO03080473 (SCHMERMUND VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 3; figures 1-20 *; | [Y]US2008093233 (JONES WESLEY STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 5-7 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0062]; figures 1-22 *; | [XY]WO2008104870 (GD SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,9-14 * page 3, line 4 - page 6, line 13; figures 1-8 * [Y] 5-7 | other | US2006054518 | US5823331 | US6343691 | EP1829783 | GB2260758 |