EP2588269 - METHOD OF AND DEVICES FOR CREATING A MULTIPLICITY OF HOLES IN WORKPIECES : GLAS-INTERPOSER WITH HOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/19] | METHOD AND DEVICES FOR CREATING A MULTIPLICITY OF HOLES IN WORKPIECES | ||
[2014/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NATTERMANN, Kurt Am Sportfeld 12 55437 Ockenheim / DE | 02 /
PEUCHERT, Ulrich Türinger Strass 5A 55294 Bodenheim / DE | 03 /
MÖHL, Wolfgang Wilhelm-Leuschner-Strasse 16 67574 Osthofen / DE | 04 /
BEHLE, Stephan Stefan George Strasse 16 55239 Gau-Odernheim / DE | [2013/21] |
Former [2013/19] | 01 /
NATTERMANN, Kurt Am Sportfeld 12 55437 Ockenheim / DE | ||
02 /
PEUCHERT, Ulrich Türinger Strass 5A 55294 Bodenheim / DE | |||
03 /
MÖHL, Wolfgang Bacchusstrasse 8 67550 Worms / DE | |||
04 /
BEHLE, Stephan Stefan George Strasse 16 55239 Gau-Odernheim / DE | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Blumbach Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 11730224.0 | 04.07.2011 | WO2011EP03301 | Priority number, date | DE20101025967 | 02.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010025967 | [2013/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012000686 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588269 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588269 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/38, B26D7/10, B26F1/28, B26F1/31 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
B23K26/0093 (EP,US);
B23K26/38 (KR);
C03B33/093 (US);
B23K26/0604 (EP,US);
B23K26/0622 (EP,US);
B23K26/0853 (EP,US);
B23K26/382 (EP,US);
B23K26/40 (EP,US);
B26D7/10 (EP,KR,US);
B26F1/28 (EP,KR,US);
B26F1/31 (KR);
B23K2103/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ERZEUGEN EINER VIELZAHL VON LÖCHERN IN WERKSTÜCKEN ; GLAS-INTERPOSER MIT LÖCHERN | [2014/40] | English: | METHOD OF AND DEVICES FOR CREATING A MULTIPLICITY OF HOLES IN WORKPIECES : GLAS-INTERPOSER WITH HOLES | [2014/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIFS POUR MÉNAGER UNE PLURALITÉ DE TROUS DANS DES PIÈCES ; INTERPOSEUR EN VERRE AVEC DES TROUS | [2014/40] |
Former [2013/19] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ERZEUGEN EINER VIELZAHL VON LÖCHERN IN WERKSTÜCKEN | ||
Former [2013/19] | METHOD AND DEVICES FOR CREATING A MULTIPLICITY OF HOLES IN WORKPIECES | ||
Former [2013/19] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIFS POUR MÉNAGER UNE PLURALITÉ DE TROUS DANS DES PIÈCES | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 09.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2011 | AL | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | RS | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | IE | 04.07.2015 | LU | 04.07.2015 | BE | 31.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.07.2011 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 04.07.2015 | ||
LU | 04.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 04.07.2011 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 04.07.2015 | ||
LU | 04.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 04.07.2015 | ||
LU | 04.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 04.07.2015 | ||
LU | 04.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 04.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 04.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2010087483 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 20 * abstract *; | [YDA]WO2005097439 (SCHMIDT CHRISTIAN [CH]) [YD] 1-4,9,11,12 * page 29, paragraph 1; figure 1c; claim - * [A] 10,14,17; | [Y]JP2003311459 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [Y] 1-4,9,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] *; | [Y]JPH07241731 (SAKAE DENSHI KOGYO KK, et al) [Y] 2-4 * abstract *; | [YD]JP2006239718 (UNIV KYOTO) [YD] 4,9 * abstract *; | [A]US5367143 (WHITE JR RUSSELL T [US]) [A] 1-4,9,11,12 * column 4, lines 5-9; figure - *; | [Y]US2009033337 (PASCO ROBERT W [US]) [Y] 20 * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2006094584 (SHOJIYA MASANORI [JP], et al) [Y] 20 * paragraphs [0060] - [0067]; figure - * | by applicant | US4777338 | US6348675 | US4390774 | WO2005097439 | WO2009059786 | WO2009074338 | JP2006239718 | DE3742770 |