EP2592968 - CONNECTING DEVICE AND SIDE GRATE FOR FIXING A PULL-OUT GUIDE TO SAID SIDE GRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/21] | CONNECTING DEVICE FOR FIXING A PULL-OUT GUIDE TO A SIDE GRATE | ||
[2015/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG Vahrenkampstraße 12-16 32278 Kirchlengern / DE | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REHAGE, Daniel Wilhelm-Hauff Weg 11 09137 Chemnitz / DE | [2016/14] |
Former [2013/21] | 01 /
REHAGE, Daniel Johannisstr. 5 33611 Bielefeld / DE | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 11730313.1 | 08.07.2011 | [2015/44] | WO2011EP61595 | Priority number, date | DE20101036422 | 15.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010036422 | DE20111002257 | 26.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011002257 | [2013/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012007372 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2592968 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2592968 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/04, F24C15/16 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
F16B2/245 (EP,KR,US);
A47B88/43 (EP,KR,US);
A47B88/423 (EP,US);
F16F1/04 (EP,KR,US);
F24C15/168 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND SEITENGITTER ZUR FIXIERUNG EINER AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG AN DEM SEITENGITTER | [2015/01] | English: | CONNECTING DEVICE AND SIDE GRATE FOR FIXING A PULL-OUT GUIDE TO SAID SIDE GRATE | [2015/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON ET GRILLE LATÉRALE DESTINÉ À FIXER UN GUIDAGE À COULISSE SUR LA GRILLE LATÉRALE | [2015/01] |
Former [2013/21] | VERBINDUNGSEINRICHTUNG ZUR FIXIERUNG EINER AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG AN EINEM SEITENGITTER | ||
Former [2013/21] | CONNECTING DEVICE FOR FIXING A PULL-OUT GUIDE TO A SIDE GRATE | ||
Former [2013/21] | DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON DESTINÉ À FIXER UN GUIDAGE À COULISSE SUR UNE GRILLE LATÉRALE | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 22.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2011 | AL | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | CY | 28.10.2015 | CZ | 28.10.2015 | DK | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | ES | 28.10.2015 | FI | 28.10.2015 | HR | 28.10.2015 | IT | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | MK | 28.10.2015 | MT | 28.10.2015 | NL | 28.10.2015 | PL | 28.10.2015 | RO | 28.10.2015 | RS | 28.10.2015 | SE | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | SM | 28.10.2015 | TR | 28.10.2015 | NO | 28.01.2016 | GR | 29.01.2016 | IS | 28.02.2016 | PT | 29.02.2016 | AT | 08.07.2016 | GB | 08.07.2016 | IE | 08.07.2016 | LU | 08.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 08.07.2011 | |
BG | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
MT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
AT | 08.07.2016 | ||
GB | 08.07.2016 | ||
IE | 08.07.2016 | ||
LU | 08.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.07.2011 | |
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
MT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
AT | 08.07.2016 | ||
GB | 08.07.2016 | ||
IE | 08.07.2016 | ||
LU | 08.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.07.2011 | |
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
AT | 08.07.2016 | ||
GB | 08.07.2016 | ||
IE | 08.07.2016 | ||
LU | 08.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.07.2011 | |
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
AT | 08.07.2016 | ||
GB | 08.07.2016 | ||
IE | 08.07.2016 | ||
LU | 08.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
AT | 08.07.2016 | ||
GB | 08.07.2016 | ||
IE | 08.07.2016 | ||
LU | 08.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
GB | 08.07.2016 | ||
IE | 08.07.2016 | ||
LU | 08.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2001044992 (JAHRLING PETER [DE]); | [XYI]US6422399 (CASTILLO HENRY [US], et al); | [XY]US2004108427 (CHEN KEN-CHING [TW], et al) | by applicant | DE202005020458U |