EP2593490 - HIGH-FUNCTIONALITY POLYISOCYANATES HAVING URETHANE GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELIZALDE, Oihana 9817-5 Emerald Point Drive Charlotte NC 28279 / US | 02 /
LUCAS, Frederic An der Froschlache 7 App. 15 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
STEINBRECHER, Angelika, Maria Herdweg 94i 70193 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
TUCHBREITER, Lydie 4620 Piedmont Row Drive Charlotte NC 28210 / US | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 11730679.5 | 11.07.2011 | [2015/37] | WO2011EP61772 | Priority number, date | EP20100169337 | 13.07.2010 Original published format: EP 10169337 | [2013/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012007431 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2593490 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2593490 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/32, C08G18/79, C09D175/04, C08G18/62, C08G18/80 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
C08G18/6229 (EP);
C08G18/792 (EP);
C08G18/8025 (EP);
C09D175/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFUNKTIONELLE URETHANGRUPPEN AUFWEISENDE POLYISOCYANATE | [2013/21] | English: | HIGH-FUNCTIONALITY POLYISOCYANATES HAVING URETHANE GROUPS | [2013/21] | French: | POLYISOCYANATES PRÉSENTANT DES GROUPES URÉTHANE HAUTEMENT FONCTIONNELS | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 20.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2011 | AL | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | ES | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | IT | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | MT | 09.09.2015 | NL | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | RS | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | SM | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | NO | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 11.07.2011 | |
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.07.2011 | |
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.07.2011 | |
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.07.2011 | |
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2004060955 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9-13 * Polyisocyanat 1-3; page 9 - page 10 * * examples 1-4 * [I] 4,6-8; | [X]US2007142610 (HARASIN STEPHEN J [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * example Isocyanate A *; | [A]EP1914255 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP1134247 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * examples 1-15 * * claims 1-13 * | by applicant | EP1091991 | EP1497351 | EP1061091 | EP0620237 | DE2305695 | US3817939 | DE2631733 | US4040992 | US4324879 | DE2806731 | DE2901479 | DE3806276 | EP0010589 | EP0126299 | US4596678 | EP0126300 | US4596679 | EP0355443 | US5087739 | DE10013186 | DE10013187 | - BLANK ET AL., PROGRESS IN ORGANIC COATINGS, (1999), vol. 35, pages 19 - 29 | - D. A. WICKS, Z. W. WICKS, PROGRESS IN ORGANIC COATINGS, (1999), vol. 36, pages 148 - 172 | - Ullmanns Encyklopädie der technischen Chemie, vol. 19, pages 62 - 65 |