EP2569305 - SUBSTITUTED N-HETEROARYL TETRAHYDRO-ISOQUINOLINE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION AND THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Zhongli c/o sanofi-aventis U.S. 1041 Route 202-206 BWD-303A Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 02 /
HARTUNG, Ryan c/o sanofi-aventis U.S. 1041 Route 202-206 BWD-303A Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Rauline, Mathilde, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2015/15] |
Former [2013/12] | Rauline, Mathilde, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11731174.6 | 10.05.2011 | WO2011US35835 | Priority number, date | FR20100061064 | 22.12.2010 Original published format: FR 1061064 | US20100333385P | 11.05.2010 Original published format: US 333385 P | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011143155 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2569305 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2569305 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D403/14, C07D413/14, A61K31/4709, A61P25/00 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/10 (EP);
A61P25/12 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | 11.02.2013 | ME | 11.02.2013 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE N-HETEROARYL-TETRAHYDRO-ISOCHINOLIN-DERIVATE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2013/12] | English: | SUBSTITUTED N-HETEROARYL TETRAHYDRO-ISOQUINOLINE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION AND THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF | [2013/12] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE N-HÉTÉROARYL TÉTRAHYDRO-ISOQUINOLINES SUBSTITUÉES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET USAGE THÉRAPEUTIQUE ASSOCIÉS | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 23.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Request for further processing for: | 21.11.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.12.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2011 | AL | 08.04.2015 | AT | 08.04.2015 | BE | 08.04.2015 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | CZ | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | ES | 08.04.2015 | FI | 08.04.2015 | HR | 08.04.2015 | IT | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MK | 08.04.2015 | MT | 08.04.2015 | NL | 08.04.2015 | PL | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | RS | 08.04.2015 | SE | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | SM | 08.04.2015 | TR | 08.04.2015 | IE | 10.05.2015 | LU | 10.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | NO | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.05.2011 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
BG | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
TR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
LU | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 10.05.2011 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
BG | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
TR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
LU | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 10.05.2011 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
BG | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
TR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 08.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005087746 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009052062 (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010007382 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7223788 | - HANCOCK, BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (20060414), vol. 71, no. 8, pages 1103 - 13 | - ESBENSHADE ET AL., MOL INTERV., (200604), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 77 - 88,59 | - D. W. OLD, J.P. WOLFE, S. L. BUCHWALD, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 120, pages 9722 - 9723 | - J. P. WOLFE, H. TOMORI, J. P. SADIGHI, J. YIN, S. L. BUCHWALD, J. ORG. CHEM., (2000), vol. 65, pages 1158 - 1174 | - VAN DER POEL A.M, NOACH E.J.K, MICZEK K.A, "Temporal patterning of ultrasonic distress calls in the adult rat: effects of morphine and benzodiazepines", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (1989), vol. 97, pages 147 - 8 | - PORSOLT ET AL., "Depression: a new animal model sensitive to antidepressant treatments", NATURE, (1977), vol. 266, pages 730 - 2 |