EP2593037 - PROSTHESIS HAVING A RADIOPAQUE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sofradim Production 116 avenue du Formans 01600 Trévoux / FR | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENEGHIN, Alfredo 21 Quai Arloing F-69009 Lyon / FR | 02 /
BOURGES, Xavier Rue Saint Jean F-01140 Mogneneins / FR | 03 /
LECUIVRE, Julie 290B Rue Biolay F-69620 Le Bois d'Oingt / FR | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2013/21] | Application number, filing date | 11731396.5 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP62148 | Priority number, date | FR20100055798 | 16.07.2010 Original published format: FR 1055798 | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012007579 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2593037 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2593037 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, D04B21/12 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
A61F2/0063 (EP,US);
D04B21/12 (EP,US);
A61F2/0045 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0062 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0085 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0097 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0098 (EP,US);
D10B2403/0213 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/21] | A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROTHESE MIT EINEM RÖNTGENDICHTEN ELEMENT | [2013/21] | English: | PROSTHESIS HAVING A RADIOPAQUE ELEMENT | [2013/21] | French: | PROTHÈSE COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT RADIO-OPAQUE | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 05.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2011 | AL | 26.03.2014 | AT | 26.03.2014 | BE | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | ES | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | HR | 26.03.2014 | IT | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MK | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | NL | 26.03.2014 | PL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | RS | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | SM | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | NO | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | LU | 15.07.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.07.2011 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MK | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.07.2011 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.07.2011 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | |
NO | 26.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9806355 (EDOGA JOHN K [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 12, line 10 - page 13, line 12 *; | [A]WO2007025266 (ENVIVID DEVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0025] , [0026] , [0027] *; | [A]US2009281558 (LI JIANMIN [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 31] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US2002087174 (CAPELLO GIOVANNI [IT]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * | by applicant | WO2009071998 | WO9905990 | WO2009031035 | WO0181667 | DE19832634 | US6596002 | US5254133 | US7465489 |