EP2522169 - METHOD FOR DOWNLINK MULTI-ANTENNA MULTI-BASE STATION INTERFERENCE COORDINATION AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Ming c/o Sharp Laboratories of China Co., Ltd. Bld. 2, 1387 Zhangdong Rd. Zhangjiang High-tech Park Pudong, Shanghai 201203 / JP | 02 /
LIU, Renmao c/o Sharp Laboratories of China Co., Ltd. Bld. 2, 1387 Zhangdong Rd. Zhangjiang High-tech Park Pudong, Shanghai 201203 / JP | 03 /
LIANG, Yongming c/o Sharp Laboratories of China Co., Ltd. Bld. 2, 1387 Zhangdong Rd. Zhangjiang High-tech Park Pudong, Shanghai 201203 / JP | 04 /
ZHANG, Yingyu c/o Sharp Laboratories of China Co., Ltd. Bld. 2, 1387 Zhangdong Rd. Zhangjiang High-tech Park Pudong, Shanghai 201203 / JP | 05 /
YANG, Zeng c/o Sharp Laboratories of China Co., Ltd. Bld. 2, 1387 Zhangdong Rd. Zhangjiang High-tech Park Pudong, Shanghai 201203 / JP | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Jörg Peter Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Hoffmann, Jörg Peter Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11731873.3 | 07.01.2011 | WO2011JP50603 | Priority number, date | CN2010102031 | 07.01.2010 Original published format: CN201010002031 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011083875 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2522169 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/10, H04B7/04, H04J99/00, H04W16/28, H04W92/20 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
H04L1/06 (EP,US);
H04W72/27 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H04W72/541 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DOWNLINK-INTERFERENZKOORDINATION IN EINER MEHRFACHBASISSTATION MIT MEHREREN ANTENNEN UND ENTSPRECHENDE BASISSTATION | [2012/46] | English: | METHOD FOR DOWNLINK MULTI-ANTENNA MULTI-BASE STATION INTERFERENCE COORDINATION AND BASE STATION | [2012/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE COORDINATION D'INTERFÉRENCES DE STATIONS MULTIBASE À ANTENNES MULTIPLES ET STATION DE BASE | [2012/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 15.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007083699 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2008061253 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [X]WO2009087808 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2009530988 (QUALCOMM INCORPORATED) |