EP2511309 - STYRENE POLYMER AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Eiji c/o Chiba Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 12-54 Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11732799.9 | 13.01.2011 | WO2011JP00137 | Priority number, date | JP20100008509 | 18.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010008509 | [2012/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011086926 | Date: | 21.07.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2511309 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F12/08, C08F12/22, // C08F4/44, C08F2/38 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
C08F12/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08F112/22 (EP,US);
C08F12/12 (KR);
C08F12/22 (US);
C08F2/00 (KR);
C08F4/44 (KR);
C08F8/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F112/22, C08F2/38 (US,EP);
C08F12/22, C08F2/38 (US);
C08F8/12, C08F112/22 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/42] | C08F112/06, C08F4/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | STYROLPOLYMER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/42] | English: | STYRENE POLYMER AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2012/42] | French: | POLYMERE DE STYRENE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2012 | Translation filed | 10.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 26.05.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05148324 ; | [X]US6429273 (EBARA KENJI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * examples 5_3, 6_1, 6_2, 7_1; table 7 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 28, Database accession no. 1993-224336, XP002712056 & JPH05148324 A 19930615 (SHINETSU CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2009067999 (UNIV KYOTO); | [X]JP2007100077 (NIPPON SODA CO); | [A]JPH01313441 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [A]JPS6443507 (HIGASHIMURA TOSHINOBU); | [A]JPS596207 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C); | [A]JP2000344809 (DAICEL CHEM) | by applicant | JP2010008509 | JP2007100077 | JPH03277608 | JP2004323588 |