EP2527619 - INSERT REMOVAL DEVICE FOR GAS TURBINE STATIONARY BLADE AND INSERT REMOVAL METHOD FOR GAS TURBINE STATIONARY BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama 220-8401 / JP | [2015/16] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | ||
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUKIMOTO, Koji C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
OSAME, Yuki C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
TAKEUCHI, Yasushi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11732832.8 | 06.01.2011 | [2016/13] | WO2011JP50092 | Priority number, date | JP20100008175 | 18.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010008175 | [2012/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011086962 | Date: | 21.07.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527619 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2527619 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/00, F01D9/02, F01D25/00, F02C7/18 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
F01D5/189 (EP,US);
F02C7/00 (KR);
F01D25/00 (KR);
F01D9/02 (KR);
F02C7/18 (KR);
F05D2230/233 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSATZENTFERNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR STATIONÄRE GASTURBINENSCHAUFELN UND EINSATZENTFERNUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR STATIONÄRE GASTURBINENSCHAUFELN | [2012/48] | English: | INSERT REMOVAL DEVICE FOR GAS TURBINE STATIONARY BLADE AND INSERT REMOVAL METHOD FOR GAS TURBINE STATIONARY BLADE | [2012/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION D'INSERT POUR AUBE FIXE DE TURBINE À GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION D'INSERT POUR AUBE FIXE DE TURBINE À GAZ | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2012 | Translation filed | 15.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 11.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.01.2011 | AL | 30.03.2016 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | IT | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | MK | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | RS | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | SM | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | NO | 30.06.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.01.2011 | |
AL | 30.03.2016 | ||
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.01.2011 | |
AL | 30.03.2016 | ||
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 06.01.2011 | |
AL | 30.03.2016 | ||
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.01.2011 | |
AL | 30.03.2016 | ||
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 30.03.2016 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5797725 (RHODES JEFFREY F [US]) [A] 1-4* column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 39; figures 3,4a,5 *; | [A]EP2025864 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * | International search | [A]JPS5976671 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS62246424 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPH10203493 (GKN WESTLAND HELICOPTERS LTD); | [A]JPH112103 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]US2009067987 (PELLET PAUL M [US], et al) | by applicant | JPS6412103 |