Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP2593094

Designated contracting statesALLapse: 06.12.2017
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 ISLapse: 06.04.2018
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LULapse: 07.07.2018
 LV 
 MCLapse: 06.12.2017
 MKLapse: 06.12.2017
 MTLapse: 06.12.2017
 NL 
 NOLapse: 06.03.2018
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RSLapse: 06.12.2017
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SMLapse: 06.12.2017
 TR 
Examination procedure24.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase12.02.2013National basic fee paid 
12.02.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2013Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted06.12.2017
Opposition procedure07.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit published on 14.11.2018 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:22.05.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20130212
 
Event date:22.05.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:16.10.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20160729
 
Event date:29.03.2017 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20170228
 
Event date:28.06.2017 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED)
 
Event date:02.08.2017 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20170707
 
Event date:29.11.2017 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
 
Event date:06.12.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:06.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:15.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 951744 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20171215
 
Event date:04.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 502011013409 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:27.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN
 
Event date:15.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:12.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20180309
 
Event date:27.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:21.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:04.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2661973 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20180404
 
Event date:16.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E015003 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20180306
 
Event date:12.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 2593094 PT 20180312 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20180306
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20180306
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171206
 
Event date:12.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:8
 
Event date:02.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 26880 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:06.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20180400673 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20180627
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171206
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171206
 
Event date:07.09.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 502011013409 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:29.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E038399 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:14.11.2018 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20180907
 
Event date:29.03.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171206
 
Event date:29.03.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180707
 
Event date:06.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:06.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR TUEP P20180396 HR
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED
 
Event date:28.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20180396 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20190613
Year of Fee Payment:9
 
Event date:20.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR T1PR P20180396 HR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA
 
Event date:30.06.2020 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20171206
 
Event date:10.07.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20180396 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20200619
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171206
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20180406
 
Event date:03.11.2017 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:27.10.2017 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:06.07.2017 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:24.05.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1
 
Event date:27.02.2017 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:19.04.2013 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:12.10.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:06.08.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20180396 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20210706
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:12.10.2018 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261
 
Event date:05.08.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20180396 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20220620
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:03.11.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED
 
Event date:06.07.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:24.05.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:27.02.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:05.07.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230526
 
Event date:21.07.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20180396 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20230704
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:18.01.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 502011013409 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:A. NATTERMANN & CIE. GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAE, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 65929 FRANKFURT, DE
 
Event date:15.02.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE HC1A E015003 EE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF OWNER NAME
 
Event date:15.02.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE GB1A E015003 EE
Code Expl.: CHANGE IN THE OWNERSHIP OR IN THE ADDRESS OF THE OWNER
 
Event date:28.02.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK PC4A E 26880 SK
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT AND TRANSFER OF RIGHTS
OWNER:A. NATTERMANN & CIE. GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAEN, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, FRANKFURT AM MAIN, DE
Effective DATE:20240212
 
Event date:04.03.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR PPPP P20180396 HR
Code Expl.: TRANSFER OF RIGHTS
OWNER:A. NATTERMANN & CIE GMBH, DE
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SI SP73
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER
OWNER:A. NATTERMANN & CIE. GMBH; DE
Effective DATE:20240306
 
Event date:08.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20240924
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:10.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20240918
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:10.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20240918
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:10.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20240925
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:10.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20240927
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:10.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20240927
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:11.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20240925
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:11.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20240926
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:14.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20240918
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:14.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20240927
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:15.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20240927
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:16.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20240925
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:16.10.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20240919 AND 20240925
 
Event date:17.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20240926
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:11.10.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20180396 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20240918
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:23.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20240919
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:23.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20240918
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:24.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20240919
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:28.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20240919
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:29.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20240917
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:29.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20240918
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:29.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20240927
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:30.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20240919
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20240927
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20240919
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20240919
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:29.11.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20240920
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:28.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20241001
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20241002
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:07.02.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE PD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP
OWNER:A. NATTERMANN & CIE. GMBH; DE
Free Format Text:DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Effective DATE:20241122
 
Event date:05.04.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI PCE
Code Expl.: NEW ASSIGNEE OR OWNER (EP PATENT)
OWNER:A. NATTERMANN & CIE. GMBH
 
Event date:28.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20240919
Year of Fee Payment:14