|
20.11.2017 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
98 |
|
12.01.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |