EP2598943 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seung, Hee Yongsomaeul cheil Apt. 102-604 Songcheondong-1 -ga Deokjin-gu jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 561-301 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Dae, Hyun Shinyoungjiwell Homes 101-701 Bokdae-dong, Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 361-270 / KR | 03 /
KWON, Dong, Won Wansanku, Seoshin-dong Donga-Hanil Apt. 119-504 Jeonju, Jeonbuk / KR | [2013/26] |
Former [2013/23] | 01 /
LEE, Seung, Hee Yongsomaeul cheil Apt. 102-604 Songcheondong-1 -ga Deokjin-gu jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 561-301 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Dae, Hyun Pyeonghwa jugong apt. 505-505 Pyeonghwadong-1-ga Wansan-gu jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 560-281 / KR | |||
03 /
KWON, Dong, Won 664-14, Deokjindong-1-ga Deokjin-gu jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 561-191 / KR | Application number, filing date | 11734012.5 | 08.07.2011 | [2017/34] | WO2011EP03431 | Priority number, date | KR20100072281 | 27.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100072281 | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012013291 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2598943 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2598943 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
G02F1/133711 (EP,US);
G02F1/13306 (US);
G02F1/1333 (US);
G02F1/133726 (EP,US);
G02F1/133742 (EP,US);
G02F1/133746 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | G02F1/139 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE UND METHODE ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2017/12] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF | [2013/23] | French: | AFFICHAGEUR À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET MÉTHODE DE SON PRÉPARATION | [2017/12] |
Former [2013/23] | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2013/23] | AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 05.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2011 | AL | 23.08.2017 | AT | 23.08.2017 | CY | 23.08.2017 | CZ | 23.08.2017 | DK | 23.08.2017 | EE | 23.08.2017 | ES | 23.08.2017 | FI | 23.08.2017 | HR | 23.08.2017 | IT | 23.08.2017 | LT | 23.08.2017 | LV | 23.08.2017 | MC | 23.08.2017 | MK | 23.08.2017 | NL | 23.08.2017 | PL | 23.08.2017 | PT | 23.08.2017 | RO | 23.08.2017 | RS | 23.08.2017 | SE | 23.08.2017 | SI | 23.08.2017 | SK | 23.08.2017 | SM | 23.08.2017 | TR | 23.08.2017 | BG | 23.11.2017 | NO | 23.11.2017 | GR | 24.11.2017 | IS | 23.12.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.07.2011 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MK | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 08.07.2011 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 23.08.2017 | |
NO | 23.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6781657 (KIM HYANG YUL [KR], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 5, line 60 - column 7, line 37 * * figure 1 *; | [XI]US2009284700 (KIM HEE-SEOP [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0097] * * figures 1-9 * [I] 6,9; | [A] - LEE S H; KIM S M; WU S-T, "Review paper: Emerging vertical-alignment liquid-crystal technology associated with surface modification using uv-curable monomer", SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION DISPLAY, (200907), vol. 17, no. 7, doi:10.1889/JSID17.7.551, pages 551 - 559, XP002658630 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1889/JSID17.7.551 | Examination | US2008266480 | US2010002157 |