EP2527393 - HIGH-DIELECTRIC FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATEMICHI, Mayuko c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
TAKANO, Nanako c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
OTA, Miharu c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 04 /
YOKOTANI, Kouji c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 05 /
KOMATSU, Nobuyuki c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 06 /
MUKAI, Eri c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 07 /
KOH, Meiten c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11734555.3 | 11.01.2011 | WO2011JP50259 | Priority number, date | JP20100010335 | 20.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010010335 | [2012/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011089948 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527393 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08K3/20, C08L27/16, H01B3/00, H01G4/18, H01G4/20 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
H01B3/445 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/20 (KR);
C08L27/16 (KR);
H01B3/00 (KR);
H01G4/18 (EP,US);
H01G4/206 (EP,US);
C08J2327/16 (EP,US);
H01G4/1209 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Title | German: | HOCH-DIELEKTRISCHER FILM | [2012/48] | English: | HIGH-DIELECTRIC FILM | [2012/48] | French: | FILM HAUTEMENT DIÉLECTRIQUE | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2012 | Translation filed | 31.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 14.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2009038088 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [X]JP2009038089 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JP2007184234 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD); | [A]WO2008090947 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009206313 (KANSAI ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al); | [A]JPH0516209 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2004281677 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JPS60199046 | WO2008090947 | WO2007088924 | WO2009017109 | JP2009038088 | JP2009038089 | WO2008050971 | JPS63181411 | JPH0318113 | JPS60262414 | JPH03286514 | JPH02250306 | JP3664342B |