EP2530770 - COPPER FOIL FOR SECONDARY BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE POWER COLLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8164 / JP | [2012/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI Hideta c/o Shirogane Plant of JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-city Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | 02 /
KAMINAGA Kengo c/o Shirogane Plant of JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-city Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | 03 /
MIKI Atsushi c/o Shirogane Plant of JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-city Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | 04 /
IWASAKI Yuichi c/o Shirogane Plant of JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-city Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11734650.2 | 19.01.2011 | WO2011JP50812 | Priority number, date | JP20100012826 | 25.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010012826 | [2012/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011090044 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2530770 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, C25D5/10, C25D7/06, C25D9/08 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
C25D5/34 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/661 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/562 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/565 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/58 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/10 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/48 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/611 (EP,KR,US);
C25D7/06 (KR);
C25D9/04 (EP,KR,US);
C25D9/08 (KR);
H01M2004/021 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Title | German: | KUPFERFOLIE FÜR NEGATIVELEKTRODEN-STROMKOLLEKTOR EINER SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2012/49] | English: | COPPER FOIL FOR SECONDARY BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE POWER COLLECTOR | [2012/49] | French: | FEUILLE DE CUIVRE POUR COLLECTEUR D'ÉNERGIE D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2012 | Translation filed | 02.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 27.05.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000200610 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JP2002319432 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [X]JP2007087789 (HITACHI CABLE); | [Y]JP2009214308 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009215604 (HITACHI CABLE); | [Y]JP2009272086 (HITACHI CABLE) | by applicant | JPS6015654 | JP2002319408 | JP3742144B |