EP2525912 - SHREDDING DEVICE AND A METHOD USING SUCH A SHREDDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordiska Ekofiber Nef AB Vendevägen 15 18260 Djursholm / SE | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BYNÈLIUS, Jan-Olof Auravägen 7 S-18260 Djursholm / SE | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Carlsson, Carl Fredrik Munk Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Carlsson, Carl Fredrik Munk Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11734934.0 | 13.01.2011 | WO2011SE50034 | Priority number, date | SE20100051088 | 19.10.2010 Original published format: SE 1051088 | SE20100050071 | 22.01.2010 Original published format: SE 1050071 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011090422 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2525912 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B02C4/30, B02C4/10 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
B02C18/2291 (EP,US);
B02C18/28 (EP,US);
E04F21/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Title | German: | SHREDDERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINER SOLCHEN SHREDDERVORRICHTUNG | [2012/48] | English: | SHREDDING DEVICE AND A METHOD USING SUCH A SHREDDING DEVICE | [2012/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BROYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 25.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2014 | 31.01.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]NL8204888 ; | [A]US6109488 (HORTON PAUL H [US]); | [A]US4978252 (SPERBER HENRY [US]); | [A]US2006024456 (O'LEARY ROBERT J [US], et al); | [A]US2007057100 (SVENDSEN MELVIN [CA], et al) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1984-199121, XP008153665 & NL8204888 A 19840716 (ROUWENHORST BV) |