EP2526482 - AUTOMATIC AGGREGATION ACROSS DATA STORES AND CONTENT TYPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALDWELL, Nicholas c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
CHILAKAMARRI, Venkat Pradeep c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
AZZAM, Saliha c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
CAI, Yizheng c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
CALCAGNO, Michael c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
CHILDS, Benjamin Edward c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
CHITRAPU, Arun c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 08 /
DIMMICK, Steven c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 09 /
GAMON, Michael c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 10 /
KOHLMEIER, Bernhard SJ c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 11 /
KUO, Shiun-Zu c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 12 /
LUDWIG, Jonathan C. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 13 /
MANIS, Kimberly c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 14 /
O'KEEFE, Courtney Anne c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 15 /
PEREZ DEL CARPIO, Diego c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 16 /
PHAN, Tu Huy c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 17 /
POWELL, Kevin c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 18 /
SHAH, Jignesh c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 19 /
SHARMA, Ashish c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 20 /
TER HORST, Paulus Willem c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 21 /
WALVEKAR, Mukta Pramod c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 22 /
WANG, Ye-Yi c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11735016.5 | 13.01.2011 | WO2011US21143 | Priority number, date | US20100818667 | 18.06.2010 Original published format: US 818667 | US20100296343P | 19.01.2010 Original published format: US 296343 P | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011090881 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2526482 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06F17/40, G06F19/28, G06Q10/00 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/48] | G06F9/06, G06F9/44, G06F17/40, G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE AGGREGATION ZWISCHEN DATENSPEICHERN UND INHALTSTYPEN | [2012/48] | English: | AUTOMATIC AGGREGATION ACROSS DATA STORES AND CONTENT TYPES | [2012/48] | French: | REGROUPEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DANS MAGASINS DE DONNÉES ET TYPES DE CONTENU | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 13.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006167861 (ARROUYE YAN [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0129] * * figures 2, 4, 5, 10, 20, 21, 29 *; | [I]US2004267700 (DUMAIS SUSAN T [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0048]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0073] *; | [I]US2009076795 (BANGALORE SRINIVAS [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0084] * | International search | [A]US2005060325 (BAKALASH REUVEN [IL], et al); | [A]US2002184170 (GILBERT JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2009164493 (JOHNSGARD TODD J [US]); | [A]US2007061371 (BODIN WILLIAM K [US], et al) | by applicant | US2006167861 |