EP2528484 - CRUSHER CLEARING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLSmidth A/S Vigerslev Allé 77 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states FLSmidth A/S Vigerslev Alle 77 2500 Valby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLOMON, Mark 2040 Ave C Bethlehem Pennsylvania 18017 / US | 02 /
FRIED, Andrew Charles 6463 Route 873 Slatington Pennsylvania 18080 / US | 03 /
LITTLEFORD, K Chris 14 Sunset Terrace Scotrun Pennsylvania 18355 / US | 04 /
REPINSKI, Walter D. 12885 W North Lane New Berlin Wisconsin 53151 / US | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/49] | Application number, filing date | 11735340.9 | 25.01.2011 | WO2011US22361 | Priority number, date | US20100298057P | 25.01.2010 Original published format: US 298057 P | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011091403 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2528484 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47J17/00, B02C2/04 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
B02C2/04 (EP);
B02C2/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | A47J17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Title | German: | ZERKLEINERER-REINIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2012/49] | English: | CRUSHER CLEARING SYSTEM | [2012/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NETTOYAGE DE BROYEUR | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 14.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/33] | 09.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5870813 (AMBROSE DAVID W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9-12,15,16 * column 4, line 18 - column 7, line 10; figure - * [Y] 5; | [XAY]US2791383 (KJELGAARD AXEL W) [X] 1-3,6,9,11,12,16 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 43; figure - * [A] 4,15 [Y] 5; | [XAY]US3754716 (WEBSTER R) [X] 1-3,6,15,16 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 59; figure - * [A] 11,12 [Y] 5; | [YA]US4012000 (DAVIS D CARTER, et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, lines 65-68; figure 2 * [A] 1,15,16; | [A]KR20090123184 (JUNG TAE HYUN [KR]) [A] 1,3,6,9-12,15,16,18 * paragraphs [0025] - [0033]; figure - * | International search | [Y]US4615491 (BATCH JOSEPH [US], et al); | [Y]US4025985 (ROUSSEAU ROY SETTLE); | [Y]US5971306 (GANSER IV WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [Y]US4261583 (DE VRIES JR DONALD S, et al); | [A]US4717084 (VENDELIN JOHN C [US], et al); | [A]US5870813 (AMBROSE DAVID W [US], et al); | [A]US3059622 (SEXAUER RUSSELL E); | [A]US2791383 (KJELGAARD AXEL W) |