Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8994392 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2015 | B2 | US2013088249 | 11.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1055121 | 25.06.2010 | WO2011FR51433 | 22.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102959360B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2015 | B | CN102959360 | 06.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1055121 | 25.06.2010 | WO2011FR51433 | 22.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2801721 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2017 | C | CA2801721 | 29.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1055121 | 25.06.2010 | WO2011FR51433 | 22.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2585796 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2017 | B1 | EP2585796 | 01.05.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR1055121 | 25.06.2010 | WO2011FR51433 | 22.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012031455 | 07.04.2020 | B1 | BR112012031455 | 08.11.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR1055121 | 25.06.2010 | WO2011FR51433 | 22.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2565341 | 20.10.2015 | C2 | RU2013103370 | 27.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1055121 | 25.06.2010 | WO2011FR51433 | 22.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011161377 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2012 | A3 | WO2011161377 | 29.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR1055121 | 25.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2961898 | 04.01.2013 | B1 | FR2961898 | 30.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1055121 | 25.06.2010 |