EP2528716 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AN INDIVIDUAL LOG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Corporation Alvar Aallon katu 1 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2015/36] |
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Corporation Eteläesplanadi 2 00130 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PÖLLÄNEN, Antti Mälkiäntie 23 FI-53300 Lappeenranta / FI | 02 /
KANGASMAA, Tuomas Keskustie 12 FI-28760 Pori / FI | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 11736671.6 | 28.01.2011 | WO2011FI50071 | Priority number, date | FI20100005078 | 29.01.2010 Original published format: FI 20105078 | [2012/49] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011092381 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2528716 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2528716 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 04.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B27B1/00, G06K9/00, B07C5/14, G01N33/46 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
B07C5/14 (EP,FI);
B27B1/007 (EP,FI);
G01N33/46 (EP,FI)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION EINES EINZELNEN BAUMSTAMMS | [2012/49] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AN INDIVIDUAL LOG | [2012/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'UNE GRUME INDIVIDUELLE | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 24.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 13.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.2016
ADMISSIBLE Stora Enso Oyj P. O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Steinrud, Henrik, et al, et al Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 65009 Karlstad / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.2016
ADMISSIBLE Stora Enso Oyj P. O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Steinrud, Henrik, et al, et al Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 SE-65009 Karlstad / SE | 11.03.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.07.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.04.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/39] | 27.04.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.05.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.05.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2011 | AL | 06.05.2015 | BE | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | ES | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | MK | 06.05.2015 | NL | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | RS | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | SM | 06.05.2015 | TR | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | GB | 28.01.2016 | IE | 28.01.2016 | LU | 28.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | BE | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | BE | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | BE | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | BE | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | BE | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | BE | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | BE | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005124323 (LAMERS MARINUS C [DE]) [X] 1-14* page 10, line 3 *; | [X]US2006260718 (NEGLAY STANFORD [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0022] *; | [X]US7426422 (CARMAN GEORGE M [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0022] * | International search | [X]FR2797975 (CT REGIONAL D INNOVATION ET TR [FR]); | [X]US2005013472 (GAUTHIER CHRISTIAN [CA]); | [X]WO2005124323 (LAMERS MARINUS C [DE]); | [X]US2006260718 (NEGLAY STANFORD [US], et al); | [X]US7426422 (CARMAN GEORGE M [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2005124323 | US2006260718 | US7426422 | Opposition | - FLODIN J et al., "Fingerprint traceability of logs using the outer shape and the tracheid effect", Forest Products Journal, (20080400), vol. 58, no. 4, pages 21 - 27, XP055274741 | - CHIORESCU S et al., "The fingerprint approach: Using data generated by a JD log scanneron debarked logs to accomplish traceability in the sawmill's log yard", Forest Products Journal, (20041200), vol. 54, no. 12, pages 269 - 276, XP055274746 | - FLODIN J et al., "Fingerprint traceability of sawn products using x-ray log scanningand sawn timber surface scanning", COST E53 Conference - Quality Control for Wood and Wood Products, Warsaw, Poland, (20071015), pages 39 - 42, XP055274753 | - LYNCH et al., "Comparison of log volume estimates using formulae for Jog center of gravity and center of volume", Canadian Journal of Forest Research, (19940000), vol. 24, pages 133 - 138, XP055274756 |