EP2530124 - FIBER-REINFORCED THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION, REINFORCING FIBER BUNDLE, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF FIBER-REINFORCED THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2012/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIYA, Atsuki c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-3193 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Hideaki c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 9-1, Oe-cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 03 /
HONMA, Masato c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome, Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 04 /
KAGEISHI, Ichiji c/o Chiba Plant Toray Fine Chemicals Co. Ltd. 2-3 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0196 / JP | 05 /
ANDO, Yumi c/o Chiba Plant Toray Fine Chemicals Co. Ltd. 2-3 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0196 / JP | [2021/08] |
Former [2012/49] | 01 /
TSUCHIYA, Atsuki c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-3193 / JP | ||
02 /
SASAKI, Hideaki c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 9-1, Oe-cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
HONMA, Masato c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome, Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | |||
04 /
KAGEISHI, Ichiji c/o Chiba Plant Toray Fine Chemicals Co. Ltd. 2-3 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0196 / JP | |||
05 /
ANDO, Yumi c/o Chiba Plant Toray Fine Chemicals Co. Ltd. 2-3 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0196 / JP | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2021/08] |
Former [2012/49] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11737010.6 | 26.01.2011 | [2021/08] | WO2011JP51398 | Priority number, date | JP20100018296 | 29.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010018296 | JP20100018295 | 29.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010018295 | [2012/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011093297 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2530124 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2530124 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/04, C08L51/06 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C08J5/042 (EP,US);
C08L23/26 (US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (US);
C08L81/04 (US);
C08J2333/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/06, C08L33/066 (US,EP);
C08L51/06, C08L33/26 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2013/37] | C08J5/04 | ||
Former IPC [2012/49] | C08L101/00, C08K7/02, D01F9/22, D06M15/263, D06M15/285 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASERVERSTÄRKTE THERMOPLASTISCHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERSTÄRKENDES FASERBÜNDEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FASERVERSTÄRKTEN THERMOPLASTISCHEN HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2012/49] | English: | FIBER-REINFORCED THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION, REINFORCING FIBER BUNDLE, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF FIBER-REINFORCED THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION | [2012/49] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE THERMOPLASTIQUE RENFORCÉE PAR DES FIBRES, FAISCEAU DE FIBRES DE RENFORT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE THERMOPLASTIQUE RENFORCÉE PAR DES FIBRES | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2012 | Translation filed | 27.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 18.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2011 | AL | 24.02.2021 | AT | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | CZ | 24.02.2021 | DK | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | ES | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | PL | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SE | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | TR | 24.02.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | NO | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 26.01.2011 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 26.01.2011 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.01.2011 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005146431 ; | [A]GB1383212 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [A] 1-15* claim - *; | [A]US2009143524 (NAKAYAMA YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,11,13,15-17 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 45, Database accession no. 2005-438394, XP002708719 & JP2005146431 A 20050609 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH09176923 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH1119998 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP2003261359 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) | Examination | JP2009074229 | by applicant | JPS5869047 | JPS59137573 | JPS61209940 | JP2005146431 | JP2006104608 | WO2007037260 | WO2007097436 | - R. F. FEDORS, "A Method for Estimating Both the Solubility Parameters and Molar Volumes of Liquids", POLM. ENG. SCI., (1974), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 147 - 154 | - SP value Foundation/Application and Calculation Method(Sixth ed.,, JOHOKIKO, CO., LTD., (2008), page 69 | - DOI, M.; EDWARDS, S.F., THE THEORY OF POLYMER DYNAMICS, (1986), page 324 |