EP2532699 - METHOD FOR PREPARING POLYARYLENE SULFIDE HAVING A LOWER CONTENT OF IODINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Chemicals, Co., Ltd. 600 Jeongja 1-dong Jangan-ku Suwon-si, Kyungki-do 440-301 / KR | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Yong-Jun 53-61 Changcheon-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-180 / KR | 02 /
CHA, Il-Hoon 330-1502 Raemian Sur Apt. Wonmun-dong Gwacheon-si Gyeonggi-do 427-739 / KR | 03 /
LIM, Jae-Bong 105-804 Mokryeon Apt. Hogye-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Sung-Gi 207-2203 Dongcheon Maeul Hyundai Hometown Apt. Dongcheon-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-511 / KR | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/50] | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 85a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11737324.1 | 31.01.2011 | [2016/19] | WO2011KR00667 | Priority number, date | KR20100009115 | 01.02.2010 Original published format: KR 20100009115 | [2012/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011093685 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2532699 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2532699 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/16, C08J5/18 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
C08G75/16 (KR);
C08G75/14 (US);
C08G75/0204 (KR);
C08G75/0263 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYARYLENSULFID MIT GERINGEREM ANTEIL AN IODIN | [2012/50] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING POLYARYLENE SULFIDE HAVING A LOWER CONTENT OF IODINE | [2012/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE SULFURE DE POLYARYLÈNE À TENEUR EN IODE RÉDUITE | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2012 | Translation filed | 30.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 14.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2011 | AL | 11.05.2016 | AT | 11.05.2016 | BE | 11.05.2016 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | CZ | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | MK | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | RO | 11.05.2016 | RS | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | SM | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | NO | 11.08.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | IS | 11.09.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | CH | 31.01.2017 | IE | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | LU | 31.01.2017 | MT | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 31.01.2011 | |
AL | 11.05.2016 | ||
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 31.01.2011 | |
AL | 11.05.2016 | ||
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 31.01.2011 | |
AL | 11.05.2016 | ||
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 31.01.2011 | |
AL | 11.05.2016 | ||
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.01.2011 | |
AL | 11.05.2016 | ||
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.05.2016 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | |
NO | 11.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5177183 (HAY ALLAN S [CA], et al) [X] 1-17 * examples 4 and 5 *; | [X]EP0403407 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-17 * examples 1-3 together with page 4, line 44 (= addition of naphthalene falling under present formula (1)) *; | [X]US5239052 (HAY ALLAN S [CA], et al) [X] 1-17 * examples 4 and 5 *; | [X]EP0354133 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-17 * examples 1-3 together with page 5, lines 40-41 (= addition of naphthalene falling under present formula (1)) * | International search | [X]US5177183 (HAY ALLAN S [CA], et al); | [X]EP0403407 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US4786713 (RULE MARK [US], et al); | [A]US6201098 (HAUBS MICHAEL [DE], et al) | by applicant | US2513188 | US2583941 | US4746758 | US4786713 |