|
09.10.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2013 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |